Global Patent Index - EP 1100577 A4

EP 1100577 A4 2002-09-11 - STATIC DEVICES AND METHODS TO SHRINK TISSUES FOR INCONTINENCE

Title (en)

STATIC DEVICES AND METHODS TO SHRINK TISSUES FOR INCONTINENCE

Title (de)

STATISCHE VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN FÜR DIE INKONTINENZ ZUM SCHRIMPFEN VON GEWEBE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIFS STATIQUES ET TECHNIQUES POUR INCONTINENTS PERMETTANT DE CONTRACTER LES TISSUS

Publication

EP 1100577 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 99938870 A

Priority

  • US 9917197 W
  • US 9494698 P
  • US 17076798 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0006246A1] The invention provides improved devices, methods, and systems for repeatably and reliably contracting fascia and other support tissues, particularly for the treatment of urinary incontinence. Rather than relying on a surgeon's ability to observe, direct, and control the selective shrinking of pelvic support tissues, a relatively large surface of a tissue contraction system is placed statically against the target tissue. Sufficient controlled energy is transmitted from the surface into the engaged tissue to contract the tissue and inhibit in continence (or otherwise provide the desired therapeutic results).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61B 18/00; A61B 18/14; A61N 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61N 1/36 (2006.01); A61B 18/14 (2006.01); A61N 1/05 (2006.01); A61B 18/00 (2006.01); A61B 18/08 (2006.01); A61B 18/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61B 18/1402 (2013.01); A61B 18/14 (2013.01); A61B 18/1482 (2013.01); A61B 18/08 (2013.01); A61B 18/1206 (2013.01); A61B 2018/00005 (2013.01); A61B 2018/00023 (2013.01); A61B 2018/00047 (2013.01); A61B 2018/0016 (2013.01); A61B 2018/00505 (2013.01); A61B 2018/00553 (2013.01); A61B 2018/00702 (2013.01); A61B 2018/00726 (2013.01); A61B 2018/00761 (2013.01); A61B 2018/00791 (2013.01); A61B 2018/00875 (2013.01); A61B 2018/124 (2013.01); A61B 2018/1253 (2013.01); A61B 2018/126 (2013.01); A61B 2018/1861 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0006246 A1 20000210; AU 5326199 A 20000221; AU 755674 B2 20021219; CA 2339110 A1 20000210; EP 1100577 A1 20010523; EP 1100577 A4 20020911; JP 2002521153 A 20020716

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-14 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051220

2005-08-10 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: STATIC DEVICES TO SHRINK TISSUES FOR INCONTINENCE

2005-01-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SOLARANT MEDICAL, INC.

2004-04-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040304

2002-09-11 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020726

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61B 18/00 A, 7A 61N 1/00 B, 7A 61B 18/14 B

2001-08-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61B 18/14 A

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE