Global Patent Index - EP 1100590 A1

EP 1100590 A1 2001-05-23 - STANDBY REGULATOR FOR BREATHING SYSTEM

Title (en)

STANDBY REGULATOR FOR BREATHING SYSTEM

Title (de)

BEDARFSABHÄNGIGER REGLER FÜR EIN ATMUNGSSYSTEM

Title (fr)

REGULATEUR A LA DEMANDE POUR SYSTEME RESPIRATOIRE

Publication

EP 1100590 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99932948 A

Priority

  • FR 9901803 W
  • FR 9809493 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2781381A1] The respirator regulator has a gas intake (12), a tube (14) for connecting to the inside of a mask, a dilution air feed (32,34), an exhalation valve (36) and a manual control (38). It also incorporates a valve (44) that is actuated when the mask is fitted to the face or by the pressure of application to prevent the gas (oxygen) being fed under prsesure to the mask before it has been put on.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62B 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62B 9/00 (2006.01); A62B 9/02 (2006.01); B64D 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62B 9/027 (2013.01); Y10S 137/908 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0004956A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2781381 A1 20000128; FR 2781381 B1 20000929; AU 4915399 A 20000214; AU 749421 B2 20020627; CA 2338178 A1 20000203; CA 2338178 C 20060221; DE 69942768 D1 20101028; EP 1100590 A1 20010523; EP 1100590 B1 20100915; JP 2002521101 A 20020716; US 6994086 B1 20060207; WO 0004956 A1 20000203

INPADOC legal status


2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-04-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69942768

- Effective date: 20140201

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120713

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110722

2012-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110722

2011-10-13 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 69942768

- Effective date: 20110616

2011-08-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110616

2011-06-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20101226

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100915

2011-03-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100915

2010-10-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69942768 P 20101028

2010-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT SE

2010-09-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2010-06-30 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2010-06-30 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT SE

2004-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030405

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010125

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI