Global Patent Index - EP 1100595 A1

EP 1100595 A1 2001-05-23 - GOLF BALL HAVING A POLYURETHANE COVER

Title (en)

GOLF BALL HAVING A POLYURETHANE COVER

Title (de)

MIT EINEM POLYURETHANMANTEL ÜBERZOGENER GOLFBALL

Title (fr)

BALLE DE GOLF A REVETEMENT EN POLYURETHANNE

Publication

EP 1100595 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00922249 A

Priority

  • US 0010190 W
  • US 29563599 A
  • US 36191299 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0062869A1] A golf ball (10) having a polyurethane cover (16) composed of a blend of polyurethane prepolymers is disclosed herein. The blend may be a dual blend with a TDI-based polyurethane prepolymer blended with a second diisocyanate polyurethane prepolymer, typically a PPDI-based polyurethane prepolymer. The blend may also be a tri-blend with a TDI-based polyurethane prepolymer blended with two other diisocyanate polyurethane prepolymers, typically two different PPDI-based polyurethane prepolymers. The golf ball (10) has a durability of at least 3.0 on a shear test rating of the cover. The golf ball (10) of the present invention also demonstrates tremendous distance using a BIG BERTHA3 HAWKEYE3 driver.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63B 37/06; A63B 37/12; C08G 18/08; C08G 18/34; D01F 6/78

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63B 37/06 (2006.01); A63B 37/00 (2006.01); A63B 37/02 (2006.01); A63B 37/12 (2006.01); C08G 18/08 (2006.01); C08G 18/10 (2006.01); C08G 18/34 (2006.01); C08G 18/42 (2006.01); C08G 18/76 (2006.01); D01F 6/78 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08G 18/7664 (2013.01); A63B 37/0003 (2013.01); A63B 37/02 (2013.01); C08G 18/10 (2013.01); C08G 18/4277 (2013.01); A63B 37/0031 (2013.01); A63B 37/0033 (2013.01); A63B 37/0075 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C08G 18/10 + C08G 18/3206

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0062869 A1 20001026; AU 4246300 A 20001102; CA 2341546 A1 20001026; EP 1100595 A1 20010523; EP 1100595 A4 20090114; NZ 510265 A 20030228

INPADOC legal status


2014-03-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C08G 18/08 20060101ALI20140211BHEP

2014-03-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A63B 37/06 20060101AFI20140211BHEP

2014-03-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D01F 6/78 20060101ALI20140211BHEP

2014-03-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A63B 37/12 20060101ALI20140211BHEP

2014-03-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C08G 18/34 20060101ALI20140211BHEP

2012-05-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20111101

2009-01-14 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20081212

2007-11-23 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1033654

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB SE

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010312

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE