Global Patent Index - EP 1100605 A1

EP 1100605 A1 2001-05-23 - THICKENER

Title (en)

THICKENER

Title (de)

EINDICKER

Title (fr)

EPAISSISSEUR

Publication

EP 1100605 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99914409 A

Priority

  • DE 9900359 W
  • DE 19805593 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19805593A1] The invention relates to methods and corresponding devices for mechanically draining on a continuous basis suspensions (12) and sludge containing water, especially suspensions of waste paper or sewage sludge, between an endless strainer band (1) and an endless and smooth compression surface (7) which moves in the scrolling direction of the suspensions. The suspension cake (13) to be drained is compressed between the strainer band (1) and the compression surface (7). To achieve the required compression pressure, the strainer band encompasses the cylindrical compression surface while applying a longitudinal stress during draining, the expelled water (14) being withdrawn from the suspension cake (13) by means of the strainer band. According to the invention, devices are provided for increasing the time during which the draining pressure of the strainer band is applied to the suspension cake and for simultaneously increasing in a substantial way the compression pressure without preventing the expelled water from flowing. The inventive method increases the compression pressure from approximately 1 bar, which is the pressure applied until now, up to values approaching 100 bars. Said method can also be implemented as part of known draining methods for increasing the resistance of solid substances without necessarily increasing in a substantial way the required space or the complexity of use.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01D 33/04; B30B 9/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01D 33/052 (2006.01); D21C 9/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21C 9/18 (2013.01); B30B 9/241 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19805593 A1 19990819; AT 293487 T 20050515; CA 2320997 A1 19990819; EP 1100605 A1 20010523; EP 1100605 B1 20050420; ES 2242390 T3 20051101; US 6514381 B1 20030204; WO 9940994 A1 19990819

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080210

2009-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080211

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080210

2009-05-04 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080211

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080229

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080902

2008-12-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081031

2008-11-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080210

2008-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080229

2008-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080210

2008-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080229

2008-10-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080210

2008-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070216

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070531

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: VOITH SULZER PAPIERTECHNIK PATENT G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20060228

2007-04-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070425

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-02-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070226

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-02-22 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070222

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-02-22 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070222

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-02-12 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20070212

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-12-01 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061201

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-04-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060123

2006-03-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2005-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2242390 T3

2005-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-09-07 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2005-08-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2005-08-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

- Free text: VOITH SULZER PAPIERTECHNIK PATENT GMBH#SANKT POELTENER STRASSE 43#89522 HEIDENHEIM (DE) -TRANSFER TO- VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH#SANKT POELTENER STRASSE 43#89522 HEIDENHEIM (DE)

2005-08-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050711

2005-07-20 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050720

2005-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59911950 P 20050525

2005-04-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-04-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL

2005-04-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-04-20 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050420

2003-10-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030822

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000906

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL