Global Patent Index - EP 1100613 A1

EP 1100613 A1 2001-05-23 - METHOD FOR REGENERATING A NOx ACCUMULATION CATALYST

Title (en)

METHOD FOR REGENERATING A NOx ACCUMULATION CATALYST

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR REGENERATION EINES NOx-SPEICHERKATALYSATORS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR REGENERER UN POT CATALYTIQUE A ACCUMULATION DE NOx

Publication

EP 1100613 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99939250 A

Priority

  • DE 9901064 W
  • DE 19823512 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19823512A1] Regeneration of an NOx accumulation catalyst in the exhaust system of an internal combustion engine operated with a lean mixture is carried out during the load phases requiring positive torque once the actual loading degree of the NOx accumulation catalyst surpasses a threshold. In such load phases, the internal combustion engine is operated with a defined rich mixture, whereby the mixture is richer than the one required for operating the internal combustion engine during the load phase.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01D 53/94; B01D 53/96

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/02 (2006.01); F02D 41/10 (2006.01); F01N 3/08 (2006.01); F02D 41/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01N 3/0842 (2013.01); F02D 41/0275 (2013.01); F02D 41/10 (2013.01); F02D 41/3029 (2013.01); F02D 2200/0806 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9961139A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19823512 A1 19991202; DE 19823512 C2 20010503; EP 1100613 A1 20010523; EP 1100613 B1 20030129; WO 9961139 A1 19991202

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170430

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-01-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101230

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090414

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-01-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031030

2003-09-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-30 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030129

2003-04-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030429

2003-03-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59904176 P 20030306

2003-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2003-01-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030129

2002-08-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020619

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000824

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE