Global Patent Index - EP 1100622 A1

EP 1100622 A1 2001-05-23 - NASAL DISPENSING HEAD AND FLUID PRODUCT DISPENSING DEVICE COMPRISING SAME

Title (en)

NASAL DISPENSING HEAD AND FLUID PRODUCT DISPENSING DEVICE COMPRISING SAME

Title (de)

NASENSPRÜHKOPF UND SPENDER FÜR MEDIEN MIT EINEM SOLCHEN SPRÜHKOPF

Title (fr)

TETE DE DISTRIBUTION NASALE ET DISPOSITIF DE DISTRIBUTION DE PRODUIT FLUIDE COMPORTANT UNE TELLE TETE

Publication

EP 1100622 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99934792 A

Priority

  • FR 9901857 W
  • FR 9809984 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2782024A1] The invention concerns a dispensing head (10) for a fluid product dispensing device, said head (10) comprising a discharge pipe (11) ending in a dispensing orifice (12), an insert (20) being provided in said discharge pipe (11), the downstream end (21) of said insert (20), in the product flow direction, defining with said discharge pipe (11) downstream end part a spraying profile (13, 14). The invention is characterised in that said downstream end (21) of said insert (20) and said downstream part of said discharge pipe (11) are respectively tapered, forming a tapered spraying profile (13, 14).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 1/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61M 11/00 (2006.01); B05B 1/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 1/3442 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0007736A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2782024 A1 20000211; FR 2782024 B1 20001013; CN 1106884 C 20030430; CN 1316925 A 20011010; DE 69913971 D1 20040205; DE 69913971 T2 20041028; EP 1100622 A1 20010523; EP 1100622 B1 20040102; JP 2002522206 A 20020723; JP 4319783 B2 20090826; US 2002134863 A1 20020926; US 6585172 B2 20030701; WO 0007736 A1 20000217

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170727

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160202

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150728

2016-03-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150728

2016-02-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69913971

2015-07-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-06-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69913971

- Representative's name: STAUDT IP LAW, DE

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140728

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140717

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140711

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130710

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-08-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: APTAR FRANCE SAS, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: VALOIS S.A.S., LE NEUBOURG, FR

- Document: DE 69913971

- Effective date: 20130617

2013-08-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69913971

- Representative's name: BITTNER & PARTNER, DE

- Effective date: 20130617

2013-08-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69913971

- Representative's name: STAUDT IP LAW, DE

- Effective date: 20130617

2013-06-17 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69913971

- Representative's name: BITTNER & PARTNER, DE

2013-02-08 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: APTAR FRANCE SAS, FR

- Effective date: 20130104

2004-12-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041005

2004-08-25 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-06-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040512

2004-02-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69913971 P 20040205

2004-01-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2004-01-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-07-16 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: NASAL DISPENSING HEAD AND FLUID PRODUCT DISPENSING DEVICE COMPRISING SAME

2003-03-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030124

2003-03-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALOIS S.A.S.

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010222

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE