Global Patent Index - EP 1100624 A1

EP 1100624 A1 2001-05-23 - FLUID PRODUCT DISPENSING DEVICE

Title (en)

FLUID PRODUCT DISPENSING DEVICE

Title (de)

SPENDER FÜR FLUIDE MEDIEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE DISTRIBUTION DE PRODUIT FLUIDE

Publication

EP 1100624 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99934790 A

Priority

  • FR 9901855 W
  • FR 9810033 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2781767A1] The invention concerns a fluid product dispensing device comprising a fluid product reservoir, a dispensing member (10), such as a pump operating without air recovery, a turret (20) fixedly supporting said pump (10), said turret being fixed on said reservoir for a fixing ring. The invention is characterised in that at least part (21) of said turret (20) is made of a plastic material permeable to air.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B67D 1/10 (2006.01); B05B 11/00 (2006.01); B65D 47/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 11/0021 (2013.01); B05B 11/0016 (2013.01); B05B 11/0008 (2013.01); B05B 11/3018 (2013.01); B05B 11/3025 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0007738A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2781767 A1 20000204; FR 2781767 B1 20001013; CN 1106886 C 20030430; CN 1316926 A 20011010; DE 69916616 D1 20040527; DE 69916616 T2 20050428; EP 1100624 A1 20010523; EP 1100624 B1 20040421; JP 2002522207 A 20020723; US 6360919 B1 20020326; WO 0007738 A1 20000217

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170727

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-02-08 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: APTAR FRANCE SAS, FR

- Effective date: 20130104

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070728

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070728

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080201

2008-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070728

2006-07-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060731

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-07-19 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060719

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-06-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060629

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-04-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050124

2004-12-01 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-07-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040701

2004-05-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69916616 P 20040527

2004-05-19 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2004-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-04-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-03-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALOIS S.A.S.

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010222

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE