Global Patent Index - EP 1100639 B1

EP 1100639 B1 2002-11-06 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CASTING A STRAND OF LIQUID METAL

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CASTING A STRAND OF LIQUID METAL

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUM GIESSEN EINES STRANGES AUS FLÜSSIGEM METALL

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR COULER UNE BRAME A PARTIR DE METAL LIQUIDE

Publication

EP 1100639 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99948676 A

Priority

  • DE 9902273 W
  • DE 19835421 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19835421A1] The invention relates to a method for casting a strand (1) of liquid metal which is cast into a mould (3) and withdrawn from said mould as a strand. The liquid metal level (g), i.e. the level of liquid metal in the mould (3), by means of a mould level control (20) comprising at least one integrator (22) is adjusted to a defined liquid level set-point value (g*) and the output of the integrator (22) of the mould level control (20) is replaced by a defined additional value (c) if the difference ( DELTA g) between the actual liquid level value (g) and the liquid level set-point value (g*) exceeds a tolerance threshold.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/181 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19835421 A1 20000224; DE 19835421 C2 20011115; AT 227182 T 20021115; EP 1100639 A1 20010523; EP 1100639 B1 20021106; US 6505676 B1 20030114; WO 0007756 A1 20000217

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140724

2015-03-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-05-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130723

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-24 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59903333

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-03-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 227182 T

- Effective date: 20130723

2014-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SIEMENS A.G.

- Effective date: 20130731

2013-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130708

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120615

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-12-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20120810

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120906

- Year of fee payment: 14

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-08-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1100639E

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903333 20021212

2002-11-27 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE SE

2002-11-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 227182 T 20021115

2001-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010611

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010103

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE