Global Patent Index - EP 1100640 A1

EP 1100640 A1 2001-05-23 - CASTING SYSTEM FOR THIXOFORMS

Title (en)

CASTING SYSTEM FOR THIXOFORMS

Title (de)

EINGUSSSYSTEM FÜR DAS THIXOFORMEN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE COULEE POUR FORMES THIXOTROPES

Publication

EP 1100640 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99934657 A

Priority

  • EP 99934657 A
  • EP 9904862 W
  • EP 98810732 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0976475A1] Each material entry channel (20, 21, ...) has a circular or elliptic cross section with a substantially constant area over its entire length. Directly adjacent to the material entry cavity (19) there is a bend (25, 26, ...). Between the bend (25, 26, ...) and the respective inlet opening (35, ...) there is a straight tubular section. The center line of the bend has a constant radius and a tangent at one end parallel to the longitudinal axis (1) of the cylindrical cavity (12) of the casting chamber. Its tangent at the other end coincides with the center line of the respective straight tubular section.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 17/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 17/00 (2006.01); B22D 17/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 17/007 (2013.01); B22D 17/2272 (2013.01); Y10S 164/90 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0006323A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0976475 A1 20000202; AT 225689 T 20021015; AU 5035699 A 20000221; BR 9912554 A 20010502; CA 2338502 A1 20000210; DE 59903037 D1 20021114; EP 1100640 A1 20010523; EP 1100640 B1 20021009; ES 2181457 T3 20030216; PT 1100640 E 20030228; US 6382302 B1 20020507; WO 0006323 A1 20000210

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050710

2004-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030711

2004-04-30 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-04-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040201

2004-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-03-03 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030710

2004-03-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-02-05 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040205

2004-02-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040203

2004-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040201

2004-01-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2003-10-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030710

2003-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1100640E

2003-07-11 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030711

2003-07-11 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030711

2003-07-10 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030710

2003-07-10 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030710

2003-07-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030710

2003-05-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-02-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20021223

2003-02-27 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030400064

2003-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2181457 T3

2002-11-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903037 20021114

2002-11-13 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-10-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021009

2002-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-10-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

2002-10-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-10-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 225689 T 20021015

2002-01-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011210

2001-11-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALCAN TECHNOLOGY & MANAGEMENT AG

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE