Global Patent Index - EP 1100651 A1

EP 1100651 A1 2001-05-23 - GRINDING MACHINE FOR EDGES OF SPECTACLES LENSES

Title (en)

GRINDING MACHINE FOR EDGES OF SPECTACLES LENSES

Title (de)

BRILLENGLASRANDSCHLEIFMASCHINE

Title (fr)

MEULEUSE POUR BORDS DE VERRE DE LUNETTES

Publication

EP 1100651 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99932736 A

Priority

  • DE 19834748 A
  • EP 9904444 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19834748A1] The invention relates to a grinding machine for the edges of spectacles lenses, comprising at least one grindstone and one driven shaft for holding the spectacles lenses, said shaft being able to move radially and axially relatively to the grindstone. The inventive grinding machine comprises at least one operational support which is placed in such a way that it can rotate coaxially on a spindle designed for a shaft of the grinding machine or on at least one pivoting lever which is placed in a non-aligned position on a spindle designed for a shaft of the grinding machine, said operational support being free to pivot in the space between the grindstone and the shaft holding the spectacles glasses.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 9/14; B24B 41/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 9/14 (2006.01); B24B 41/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 9/146 (2013.01); B24B 41/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0007770A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19834748 A1 20000210; EP 1100651 A1 20010523; EP 1100651 B1 20020403; US 2005107002 A1 20050519; US 2007077863 A1 20070405; US 7137871 B2 20061121; US 7338347 B2 20080304; WO 0007770 A1 20000217

INPADOC legal status


2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110630

2012-03-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120229

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100706

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-03-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030106

2003-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030101

2002-10-02 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20020403

2002-09-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59901143 20020508

2002-04-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-04-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020403

2002-04-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020403

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010914

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010224

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT