Global Patent Index - EP 1100652 A1

EP 1100652 A1 2001-05-23 - SANDING DEVICE FOR CURVED SURFACES

Title (en)

SANDING DEVICE FOR CURVED SURFACES

Title (de)

SCHLEIFVORRICHTUNG FÜR GEBOGENE FLÄCHEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE PON AGE POUR SURFACES COURBES

Publication

EP 1100652 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99963137 A

Priority

  • DE 9900082 W
  • DE 19833814 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19848918A1] The grinding device has a rotor device driving an eccentric carrier device with a shaft (16) in bearings, with a head (15) at one end to which a resting surface (11) for grinding paper is fixed. The resting surface is curved. Its top side (11) and bottom side (11') have the same curvature. It is fixed to the head via an elastic element.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 23/03; B24B 17/00; B24B 41/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 47/12 (2006.01); B24B 17/00 (2006.01); B24B 19/26 (2006.01); B24B 23/03 (2006.01); B24B 41/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 19/26 (2013.01); B24B 17/00 (2013.01); B24B 23/03 (2013.01); B24B 41/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0006339A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 29911103 U1 20000105; DE 19848918 A1 20000210; EP 1100652 A1 20010523; EP 1100652 B1 20020605; JP 2002521224 A 20020716; US 6478663 B1 20021112; WO 0006339 A1 20000210

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080801

2006-12-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061219

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-12-08 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060929

2006-09-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060116

2006-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060116

2005-01-24 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050124

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-01-06 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050106

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-05-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030306

2002-10-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-08-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020801

2002-07-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59901651 20020711

2002-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-06-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-11-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011012

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010125

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB