Global Patent Index - EP 1100655 A1

EP 1100655 A1 2001-05-23 - CLEANING PADS FORMED FROM NON-WOVEN ABRASIVE WEB MATERIAL, ESPECIALLY FOR DOMESTIC USE

Title (en)

CLEANING PADS FORMED FROM NON-WOVEN ABRASIVE WEB MATERIAL, ESPECIALLY FOR DOMESTIC USE

Title (de)

REINIGUNGSTÜCHER AUS SCHLEIFVLIESSTOFFMATERIAL, INSBESONDERE FÜR HAUSGEBRAUCH

Title (fr)

TAMPONS NETTOYEURS FORMES A PARTIR DE MATERIAU EN BANDE ABRASIF NON-TISSE, A USAGE DOMESTIQUE

Publication

EP 1100655 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99930768 A

Priority

  • GB 9816681 A
  • US 9914539 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0006341A1] A dispenser package comprises a box-shaped dispenser (12) containing a longitudinally-extending web (6) of lofty, non-woven, abrasive material comprising fibres having a tenacity of at least 7.0 g/dtex., which is partially cut, at intervals along the length of the web, along bowed transverse lines (2) enabling the web to be separated readily into pads (3). The web, which has a thickness less than 1 cm and a weight less than 500 g/m<2>, is Z-folded at the joins (5) between adjacent pads and can be withdrawn from within the dispenser through a slot-shaped opening (10) in the latter.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24D 11/00; B26F 1/22; B65D 83/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24D 3/28 (2006.01); B24D 11/00 (2006.01); B65D 71/00 (2006.01); B65D 71/08 (2006.01); B65D 83/08 (2006.01); B65D 85/671 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 71/08 (2013.01); B24D 3/28 (2013.01); B24D 11/008 (2013.01); B65D 83/0805 (2013.01); B65D 85/671 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0006341A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH ES FR GB GR IT LI PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0006341 A1 20000210; AT 223788 T 20020915; AU 4722899 A 20000221; BR 9912623 A 20010424; CO 5100953 A1 20011127; EP 1100655 A1 20010523; EP 1100655 B1 20020911; ES 2183577 T3 20030316; GB 9816681 D0 19980930; PE 08972000 A1 20000914; PT 1100655 E 20021231; TR 200100310 T2 20010723

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090628

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090629

2010-08-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090629

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-03-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100226

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080617

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080626

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080626

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-03-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2004-02-18 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030628

2003-12-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-06-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030628

2003-03-27 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2183577 T3

2003-02-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20021107

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH ES FR GB GR IT LI PT

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-09-11 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-09-11 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-09-11 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-09-11 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-09-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 223788 T 20020915

2002-08-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MATEOS, MARIA DEL MAR CASADO

2002-08-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ALDASORO, FELIPE BARANDIARAN

2001-10-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010913

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010115

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH ES FR GB GR IT LI PT