Global Patent Index - EP 1100679 A2

EP 1100679 A2 2001-05-23 - PRINTING UNIT

Title (en)

PRINTING UNIT

Title (de)

FÜNFZYLINDEROFFSETDRUCKEINHEITEN

Title (fr)

UNITE D'IMPRESSION

Publication

EP 1100679 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99947252 A

Priority

  • DE 9902262 W
  • DE 19833469 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19833469A1] According to the invention, the cylinders in a five-cylinder printing unit of an offset printing machine are disposed forming the shape of a W.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 7/02 (2006.01); B41F 7/10 (2006.01); B41F 7/20 (2006.01); B41F 13/20 (2006.01); B41F 13/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 7/10 (2013.01); B41P 2217/11 (2013.01); B41P 2217/13 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0006383A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19833469 A1 20000210; DE 19833469 C2 20000518; EP 1100679 A2 20010523; EP 1100679 B1 20020703; JP 2002521243 A 20020716; JP 3472265 B2 20031202; US 6363848 B1 20020402; WO 0006383 A2 20000210; WO 0006383 A3 20000323

INPADOC legal status


2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-06-13 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070723

2008-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080201

2008-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070724

2008-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070723

2008-03-18 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-03-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060712

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-09-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060922

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-07-10 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060710

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-07-10 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060710

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-07-06 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060706

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-06-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030404

2003-03-19 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1100679E

2002-11-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-08-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59901954 20020808

2002-07-24 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-07-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020703

2002-07-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-07-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI SE

2002-03-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020204

2001-10-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 41F 7/10 A, 7B 41F 1/00 B

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001220

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE