Global Patent Index - EP 1100681 A1

EP 1100681 A1 2001-05-23 - FIVE-CYLINDER OFFSET PRINTING UNITS WITH ADJUSTABLE SPACING

Title (en)

FIVE-CYLINDER OFFSET PRINTING UNITS WITH ADJUSTABLE SPACING

Title (de)

ABSTANDSVERÄNDERBARE FÜNFZYLINDEROFFSETDRUCKEINHEITEN

Title (fr)

UNITES D'IMPRESSION OFFSET A CINQ CYLINDRES A ECART VARIABLE

Publication

EP 1100681 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99947253 A

Priority

  • DE 9902263 W
  • DE 19833468 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19833468A1] Printing units (01-04; 06-09) of an offset printing machine each has two molded cylinders (11-14), two transfer cylinders (16-19) and a counter printing cylinder (21). Two of the pressure units are arranged opposite each other. The pressure units (01-04; 06-09) are arranged at a relative distance from each other to be changed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 13/00; B41F 7/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 7/10 (2006.01); B41F 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 7/10 (2013.01); B41F 13/0024 (2013.01); B41P 2217/11 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0006385A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19833468 A1 20000127; DE 19833468 C2 20000518; EP 1100681 A1 20010523; EP 1100681 B1 20020703; US 6539857 B1 20030401; WO 0006385 A1 20000210

INPADOC legal status


2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-06-13 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080201

2008-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-03-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-09-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060922

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-07-10 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060710

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-07-06 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060706

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-06-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030404

2003-03-19 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1100681E

2002-11-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-08-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59901955 20020808

2002-07-24 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-07-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-07-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI

2002-03-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020204

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001220

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE