Global Patent Index - EP 1100688 A1

EP 1100688 A1 2001-05-23 - RUNFLAT TIRE HAVING OPTIMIZED CARCASS PATH

Title (en)

RUNFLAT TIRE HAVING OPTIMIZED CARCASS PATH

Title (de)

NOTLAUFREIFEN MIT OPTIMIERTEM KARKASSENPROFIL

Title (fr)

PNEUMATIQUE A AFFAISSEMENT LIMITE COMPRENANT UN CHEMIN DE CARCASSE OPTIMISE

Publication

EP 1100688 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99924536 A

Priority

US 9911812 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0073093A1] The tire of the invention has an optimized path of the outermost carcass designed to maximize the extent of tensile stress in the sidewall and bead portions of the tire. The invention further provides separate reinforcement structures in the bead portion for anchoring the carcass or carcasses in the bead and for retaining the bead on the mounting rim during deflated operation, and said anchoring reinforcement also facilitates the maintenance of the desirable carcass profile.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60C 17/00; B60C 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B29D 30/08 (2006.01); B60C 3/04 (2006.01); B60C 9/02 (2006.01); B60C 9/08 (2006.01); B60C 13/00 (2006.01); B60C 15/00 (2006.01); B60C 15/06 (2006.01); B60C 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60C 15/0018 (2013.01); B60C 3/04 (2013.01); B60C 17/0018 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0073093A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0073093 A1 20001207; AU 4101499 A 20001218; AU 762139 B2 20030619; BR 9912443 A 20011009; CA 2338573 A1 20001207; CN 1207160 C 20050622; CN 1319053 A 20011024; EP 1100688 A1 20010523; JP 2003500281 A 20030107

INPADOC legal status


2007-05-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060930

2006-06-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MICHELIN RECHERCHE ET TECHNIQUE

2004-12-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041104

2001-08-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010607

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE