Global Patent Index - EP 1100726 A2

EP 1100726 A2 2001-05-23 - SPOUT ASSEMBLY FOR LIQUID CONTAINER

Title (en)

SPOUT ASSEMBLY FOR LIQUID CONTAINER

Title (de)

AUSGIESSER FÜR FLÜSSIGKEITSBEHÄLTER

Title (fr)

ENSEMBLE BEC VERSEUR POUR RECIPIENT A LIQUIDE

Publication

EP 1100726 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99929941 A

Priority

  • KR 9900377 W
  • KR 19980029349 A
  • KR 19980063947 A
  • KR 19990000457 A
  • KR 19990009283 A
  • KR 19990013636 A
  • KR 19990015732 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0003921A2] A spout assembly (10) for a liquid container including: a body (100) coupled to the container and centrally provided with a vertical passage (101), the body (100) including a cap coupling portion (106), a thread (106a) formed around the cap coupling portion (106), and a skirt engagement member (107) formed at a lower end of the cap coupling portion (106); a spout (110) slidably inserted into the vertical passage (101) of the body, the spout (110) including an elongated tube member (111) slidably inserted into the vertical passage of the body (100), a lower annular protrusion (112) protruded from the elongated tube member (111) and adapted to be selectively fitted in the annular groove (102) of the body (100), at least one through hole (112) radially perforated through the tube member (111), the through hole (113) being closed by an inner surface of the body defining the vertical passage (101) when the lower annular protrusion (112) is fitted in the annular groove (102) of the body, an annular cap engagement protrusion (114) formed at an upper end of the tube member, an upper annular protrusion (116) formed at the tube member (111) while being vertically spaced from the annular cap engagement protrusion to define an annular groove (115), and a liquid passage (117) defined in the tube member; and a cap (120) threadedly coupled to the cap coupling portion of the body (106), the cap (120) including a cap body, an annular groove (122) formed at an inner surface of a top wall of the cap body, the annular groove being engageable with the annular cap engagement protrusion (114) of the tube member (111), an annular protrusion (123) formed at an inner surface of a side wall (101) of the cap body, the annular protrusion (123) being engageable with the annular groove (115) of the tube member, and a thread formed on the inner surface of the cap body beneath the annular contact surface and adapted to be engageable with the thread of the body (100).

[origin: WO0003921A2] A spout assembly for a liquid container including: a body coupled to the container and centrally provided with a vertical passage, the body including a cap coupling portion, a thread formed around the cap coupling portion, and a skirt engagement member formed at a lower end of the cap coupling portion; a spout slidably inserted into the vertical passage of the body, the spout including an elongated tube member slidably inserted into the vertical passage of the body, a lower annular protrusion protruded from the elongated tube member and adapted to be selectively fitted in the annular groove of the body, at least one through hole radially perforated through the tube member, the through hole being closed by an inner surface of the body defining the vertical passage when the lower annular protrusion is fitted in the annular groove of the body, an annular cap engagement protrusion formed at an upper end of the tube member, an upper annular protrusion formed at the tube member while being vertically spaced from the annular cap engagement protrusion to define an annular groove, and a liquid passage defined in the tube member; and a cap threadedly coupled to the cap coupling portion of the body, the cap including a cap body, an annular groove formed at an inner surface of a top wall of the cap body, the annular groove being engageable with the annular cap engagement protrusion of the tube member, an annular protrusion formed at an inner surface of a side wall of the cap body, the annular protrusion being engageable with the annular groove of the tube member, and a thread formed on the inner surface of the cap body beneath the annular contact surface and adapted to be engageable with the thread of the body.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 23/00 (2006.01); B65D 25/40 (2006.01); B65D 33/38 (2006.01); B65D 41/04 (2006.01); B65D 47/06 (2006.01); B65D 47/12 (2006.01); B65D 47/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 47/122 (2013.01); B65D 47/061 (2013.01); B65D 75/5883 (2013.01); B65D 2101/0023 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0003921A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0003921 A2 20000127; WO 0003921 A3 20000420; AT 307059 T 20051115; AU 4657399 A 20000207; CN 1213918 C 20050810; CN 1313822 A 20010919; DE 69927825 D1 20051124; DE 69927825 T2 20060706; EP 1100726 A2 20010523; EP 1100726 B1 20051019; ES 2251201 T3 20060416; JP 2002520232 A 20020709; JP 2005029275 A 20050203; JP 4173640 B2 20081029

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100731

2013-11-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110616

2011-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100716

2011-08-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110818

2011-07-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100201

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-07-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110616

2011-05-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69927825

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090715

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100201

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090715

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100304

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100222

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-03-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090715

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080820

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051019

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060715

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2007-05-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070330

2007-04-18 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2006-09-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060720

2006-07-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-17 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060717

2006-06-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-04-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2251201 T3

2006-04-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2006-03-20 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060320

2006-01-19 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060119

2006-01-19 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060119

2006-01-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060119

2005-11-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69927825 P 20051124

2005-11-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2005-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-10-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-10-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-10-19 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051019

2005-10-19 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051019

2005-10-19 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051019

2005-10-19 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051019

2005-10-19 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051019

2005-10-19 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051019

2002-11-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020918

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010113

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE