Global Patent Index - EP 1100741 A1

EP 1100741 A1 2001-05-23 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CUTTING YARN ON A TEXTILE MACHINE

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CUTTING YARN ON A TEXTILE MACHINE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM SCHNEIDEN VON GARN AUF EINER TEXTILMASCHINE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR COUPER UN FIL SUR UNE MACHINE A TEXTILE

Publication

EP 1100741 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99928989 A

Priority

  • CH 9900329 W
  • CH 156198 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0006479A1] The invention relates to a method and a device for cutting yarn (9) on a textile machine, comprising a blade (6) which is supplied with kinetic energy via a drive (2, 3, 4). To be able to generate at all times a sufficient yet not excessive cutting power the kinetic energy is delivered in doses and rated in accordance with properties of the yarn and/or device. The drive thus comprises a device (14) for rating the kinetic energy of the blade.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 63/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/71 (2006.01); B65H 63/06 (2006.01); H01F 7/16 (2006.01); H01F 7/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/71 (2013.01); B65H 63/062 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01); H01F 7/1607 (2013.01); H01F 7/1816 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0006479A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 0006479 A1 20000210; CN 1211269 C 20050720; CN 1311751 A 20010905; DE 59904646 D1 20030424; EP 1100741 A1 20010523; EP 1100741 B1 20030319; JP 2002521294 A 20020716; US 6381941 B1 20020507

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150719

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160202

2016-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150731

2016-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150731

2016-02-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-02-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59904646

2014-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140718

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140716

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140714

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120731

2013-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *USTER TECHNOLOGIES A.G.

- Effective date: 20120731

2011-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20110712

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-12-31 [REG CH PCOW] CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF PATENT OWNER(S)

- Free text: USTER TECHNOLOGIES AG;SONNENBERGSTRASSE 10;8610 USTER (CH)

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-06-13 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080331

2006-07-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060719

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-03-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031222

2003-12-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-09-17 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030319

2003-05-07 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: USTER TECHNOLOGIES AG

2003-04-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59904646 P 20030424

2003-03-27 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-03-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-03-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030319

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010226

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI