Global Patent Index - EP 1100742 A1

EP 1100742 A1 2001-05-23 - MEASURING DEVICE FOR THREAD-LIKE TEST SAMPLES

Title (en)

MEASURING DEVICE FOR THREAD-LIKE TEST SAMPLES

Title (de)

MESSVORRICHTUNG FÜR FADENFÖRMIGE PRÜFKÖRPER

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE MESURE POUR CORPS A CONTROLER EN FORME DE FIL

Publication

EP 1100742 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99930974 A

Priority

  • CH 9900340 W
  • CH 161298 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0007921A1] The invention relates to a measuring device for thread-like test samples (3), comprising a measuring slit (2) exhibiting measuring areas (6, 7) for measuring characteristics of a test sample which moves longitudinally, said measuring areas being associated to a measuring device. A coating (8) made of an abrasion-resistant material is applied over the whole measuring slit and its measuring areas (6, 7) in order to define more freely the dimensions of said measuring slit and especially to obtain a narrower measuring slit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 63/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 63/00 (2006.01); B65H 63/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 63/065 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0007921A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 0007921 A1 20000217; CN 1098799 C 20030115; CN 1311752 A 20010905; DE 59905211 D1 20030528; EP 1100742 A1 20010523; EP 1100742 B1 20030423; JP 2002522322 A 20020723; US 6499345 B1 20021231

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59905211

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140731

2015-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140731

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140723

2015-02-27 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-02-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59905211

2013-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130718

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130717

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130712

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120731

2013-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *USTER TECHNOLOGIES A.G.

- Effective date: 20120731

2011-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20110712

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-12-31 [REG CH PCOW] CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF PATENT OWNER(S)

- Free text: USTER TECHNOLOGIES AG;SONNENBERGSTRASSE 10;8610 USTER (CH)

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-06-13 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080331

2006-07-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060719

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-04-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040126

2004-02-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-10-22 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030423

2003-05-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59905211 P 20030528

2003-05-07 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: USTER TECHNOLOGIES AG

2003-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-04-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-04-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030423

2002-07-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020521

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI