Global Patent Index - EP 1100779 A1

EP 1100779 A1 2001-05-23 - SUBSTITUTED INDOLINONES, THE PRODUCTION THEREOF AND THEIR USE AS MEDICAMENTS

Title (en)

SUBSTITUTED INDOLINONES, THE PRODUCTION THEREOF AND THEIR USE AS MEDICAMENTS

Title (de)

SUBSTITUIERTE INDOLINONE, IHRE HERSTELLUNG UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS ARZNEIMITTEL

Title (fr)

INDOLINONES SUBSTITUEES, LEUR PRODUCTION ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME MEDICAMENTS

Publication

EP 1100779 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99926454 A

Priority

  • DE 19824922 A
  • EP 9903692 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19824922A1] The invention relates to substituted indolinones of general formula (I) in which R1 to R5 and X are defined as in Claim No. 1, to the isomers thereof, and to their salts, especially to the physiologically compatible salts thereof, which exhibit valuable pharmacological characteristics, especially an inhibiting effect on different kinases and cyclin/CDK complexes, and on the proliferation of different tumor cells. The invention also relates to medicaments containing these compounds, to their use, and to a method for the production thereof.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 209/34; A61K 31/40; A61K 31/415; A61K 31/425; A61K 31/44; A61K 31/47; A61K 31/55; C07D 209/30; C07D 401/12; C07D 403/12; C07D 417/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 401/12 (2006.01); A61K 31/403 (2006.01); A61K 31/4035 (2006.01); A61K 31/404 (2006.01); A61K 31/4178 (2006.01); A61K 31/427 (2006.01); A61K 31/4427 (2006.01); A61K 31/4439 (2006.01); A61K 31/454 (2006.01); A61K 31/4725 (2006.01); A61K 31/496 (2006.01); A61K 31/5377 (2006.01); A61K 31/541 (2006.01); A61K 31/55 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); C07D 209/30 (2006.01); C07D 209/34 (2006.01); C07D 209/44 (2006.01); C07D 403/12 (2006.01); C07D 417/12 (2006.01); C07D 471/04 (2006.01); C07D 513/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 209/30 (2013.01); C07D 209/34 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9962882A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19824922 A1 19991209; AU 4370799 A 19991220; AU 764782 B2 20030828; BG 104938 A 20010629; BR 9910898 A 20010213; CA 2328291 A1 19991209; CN 1303374 A 20010711; CO 5050294 A1 20010627; EA 003514 B1 20030626; EA 200100001 A1 20010827; EE 200000723 A 20020415; EP 1100779 A1 20010523; HR P20000831 A2 20011231; HU 0102210 A2 20011128; HU 0102210 A3 20021228; ID 27035 A 20010222; IL 138702 D0 20011031; JP 2002516906 A 20020611; NO 20006138 A 20010201; NO 20006138 D0 20001201; PL 344467 A1 20011105; SK 18222000 A3 20010806; TR 200003515 T2 20010621; WO 9962882 A1 19991209; YU 73900 A 20030430; ZA 200005435 B 20020107

INPADOC legal status


2007-05-23 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061201

2006-09-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030929

2003-11-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030929

2003-03-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMA GMBH & CO.KG

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010104

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 20010104;LV PAYMENT 20010104;RO PAYMENT 20010104;SI PAYMENT 20010104