Global Patent Index - EP 1100798 B1

EP 1100798 B1 2002-09-18 - BENZAZOLE, BENZOXAZOLE, BENZTHIAZOLE AND BENZIMIDAZOLE DERIVATIVES

Title (en)

BENZAZOLE, BENZOXAZOLE, BENZTHIAZOLE AND BENZIMIDAZOLE DERIVATIVES

Title (de)

BENZAZOL, BENZOXAZOL, BENZOTHIAZOL UND BENZIMIDAZOL DERIVATE

Title (fr)

DERIVES DE BENZAZOLE, BENZOXAZOLE, BENZTHIAZOLE ET BENZIMIDAZOLE

Publication

EP 1100798 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 99934928 A

Priority

  • GB 9902377 W
  • GB 9816654 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0006566A1] A compund of formula (I) wherein X is O or S; n is 0 or 1; Y is O, S or NR<7>; R<1> is hydrogen, halogen, C1-6 aklyl, C1-6 haloalkyl, C1-6 alkoxy, C1-6 haloalkoxy, C1-6 alkylthio, C1-6 haloalkylthio, C3-6 cycloalkyl, C1-6 alkoxy(C1-6)alkyl or SF5; R<2> is hydrogen, halogen, C1-6 alkyl, C1-6 alkoxy, C1-6 haloalkoxy, C1-6 alkylthio, C1-6 haloalkylthio, C1-6 alkylsulfinyl, C1-6 haloalkylsulfinyl, C1-6 alkylsulfonyl, C1-6 haloalkylsulfonyl, C1-6 haloalkyl, cyano, nitro, CHO, CH=NOR<5>, C1-6 alkylcarbonyl, C1-6 alkoxycarbonyl or SF5; or together R<1> and R<2> form a five or six membered saturated or unsturated carbocyclic ring, optionally substituted processes for preparing these compounds, compositions comprising them, methods of using them to combat fungal diseases and methods of using them to combat or control insect, acarine, mollusc and nematode pests.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 417/12; A01N 43/80; C07D 417/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01N 43/76 (2006.01); A01N 43/78 (2006.01); A01N 43/80 (2006.01); C07D 417/12 (2006.01); C07D 417/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 417/12 (2013.01); A01N 43/80 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0006566 A1 20000210; AP 969 A 20010529; AP 9901616 A0 19990930; AR 019486 A1 20020220; AT 224390 T 20021015; AU 5055099 A 20000221; AU 755291 B2 20021212; BR 9912616 A 20020213; CA 2338048 A1 20000210; CA 2338048 C 20100112; CN 1196699 C 20050413; CN 1320124 A 20011031; CO 5190721 A1 20020829; DE 69903044 D1 20021024; DE 69903044 T2 20030612; DK 1100798 T3 20021014; EG 22178 A 20021031; EP 1100798 A1 20010523; EP 1100798 B1 20020918; ES 2184482 T3 20030401; GB 9816654 D0 19980930; GT 199900119 A 20001116; HN 1999000127 A 19991111; HU 0103695 A2 20020128; HU 0103695 A3 20020429; IL 141109 A 20070724; IL 141109 D0 20020210; JP 2002521480 A 20020716; JP 4545933 B2 20100915; MY 133385 A 20071130; NZ 509431 A 20030829; PE 10052000 A1 20001009; PT 1100798 E 20030228; SV 1999000119 A 20000502; TW 522151 B 20030301; US 2002049142 A1 20020425; US 6544989 B2 20030408

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140731

2015-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140722

2015-08-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140721

2015-08-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150826

2015-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140731

2015-05-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150204

2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140731

2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140721

2015-05-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140722

2015-05-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140721

2015-05-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69903044

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140731

2015-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140721

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140721

2015-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140731

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-04-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150331

2015-04-22 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2015-04-06 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20020403768

- Effective date: 20150204

2015-03-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150201

2015-03-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140721

2015-03-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 224390 T

- Effective date: 20140721

2015-03-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-02-27 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140721

2015-02-27 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-02-25 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150201

2015-02-23 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20140731

2015-02-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69903044

2013-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130716

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130712

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-10-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20130624

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-10-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20130705

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20130709

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-10-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20130722

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130806

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130731

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20130701

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130708

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20130711

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-09-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20130801

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-08-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20130628

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20130624

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130624

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-03-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: SYNGENTA LIMITED SYNGENTA EUROPEAN REGIONAL CENTR

- Free text: SYNGENTA LIMITED SYNGENTA EUROPEAN REGIONAL CENTRE#PRIESTLEY ROAD, SURREY RESEARCH PARK,#GUILDFORD, SURREY GU2 7YH (GB) -TRANSFER TO- SYNGENTA LIMITED SYNGENTA EUROPEAN REGIONAL CENTRE#PRIESTLEY ROAD, SURREY RESEARCH PARK,#GUILDFORD, SURREY GU2 7YH (GB)

2005-06-30 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20050511

2005-03-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20050121

2005-03-25 [LTLA] LT: LAPSE OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20040721

2005-01-21 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050121

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2004-07-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-21 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040721

2003-10-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: SYNGENTA LIMITED SYNGENTA EUROPEAN REGIONAL CENTR

- Free text: SYNGENTA LIMITED#EUROPEAN REGIONAL CENTRE PRIESTLEY ROAD SURREY RESEARCH PARK#GUILDFORD SURREY GU2 7YH (GB) -TRANSFER TO- SYNGENTA LIMITED SYNGENTA EUROPEAN REGIONAL CENTRE#PRIESTLEY ROAD, SURREY RESEARCH PARK,#GUILDFORD, SURREY GU2 7YH (GB)

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-07-31 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20030731

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-07-15 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Payment date: 20030715

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-07-15 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20030715

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-04-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2184482 T3

2003-04-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: SYNGENTA LIMITED

2003-02-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20021217

2002-12-19 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20020403768

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69903044 20021024

2002-10-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2002-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2002-10-14 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20010228;LT PAYMENT 20010228;LV PAYMENT 20010228;MK PAYMENT 20010228;RO PAYMENT 20010228;SI PAYMENT 20010228

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-09-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SYNGENTA LIMITED

2002-09-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 224390 T 20021015

2001-09-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SYNGENTA LIMITED

2001-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010712

2001-08-01 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: BENZAZOLE, BENZOXAZOLE, BENZTHIAZOLE AND BENZIMIDAZOLE DERIVATIVES

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20010228;LT PAYMENT 20010228;LV PAYMENT 20010228;MK PAYMENT 20010228;RO PAYMENT 20010228;SI PAYMENT 20010228