Global Patent Index - EP 1100849 A1

EP 1100849 A1 2001-05-23 - METHODS FOR PREPARING SILICA-COATED CARBON PRODUCTS

Title (en)

METHODS FOR PREPARING SILICA-COATED CARBON PRODUCTS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON MIT KIESELSÄUREBESCHICHTETE KOHLENSTOFFPRODUKTEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDES DE PREPARATION DE PRODUITS CARBONES REVETUS DE SILICE

Publication

EP 1100849 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99937378 A

Priority

  • US 9916581 W
  • US 9398498 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0005312A1] Methods of making a silica-coated carbon product are described. In one method, an aqueous media or solution and a carbon product are contacted with a solution comprising a silicate substantially free of metal ions, for a sufficient time and temperature to form the silica-coated carbon product. A method of making a silica-coated product by contacting the aqueous media and a carbon product with a solution comprising monosilic acid is also described as well as exchanging metal ions in a solution comprising metallic silicate for hydrogen ions and contacting an aqueous media and a carbon product with the solution to form silica-coated carbon products. Silica-coated carbon products resulting from these methods are also described and include a plurality of silica-coated products wherein each of the silica-coated products are substantially and uniformly coated with silica and in the substantial absence of free silica. Also, elastomeric compositions and the like containing the silica-coated carbon products are described.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C09C 1/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60C 1/00 (2006.01); C01B 31/04 (2006.01); C09C 1/44 (2006.01); C09C 1/46 (2006.01); C09C 1/48 (2006.01); C09C 1/56 (2006.01); C09C 3/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C09C 1/565 (2013.01); C09C 1/56 (2013.01); C01P 2004/02 (2013.01); C01P 2004/04 (2013.01); C01P 2006/12 (2013.01); C01P 2006/19 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2991 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2993 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0005312A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0005312 A1 20000203; AT 338794 T 20060915; AU 5222299 A 20000214; DE 69933126 D1 20061019; DE 69933126 T2 20070802; EP 1100849 A1 20010523; EP 1100849 B1 20060906; ES 2272080 T3 20070416; JP 2002532572 A 20021002; JP 2009046389 A 20090305; JP 5095886 B2 20121212; US 6541113 B1 20030401

INPADOC legal status


2018-06-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170711

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-11-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170717

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170717

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170726

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170808

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170626

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170621

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-01-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69933126

- Representative's name: MEHLER ACHLER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2012-01-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69933126

- Representative's name: MEHLER ACHLER PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT MBB, DE

2009-08-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060906

2009-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070722

2008-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070723

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061207

2008-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2007-08-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070607

2007-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2272080 T3

2007-04-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-03-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-03-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2007-02-19 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070219

2006-12-27 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-12-06 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061206

2006-10-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69933126 P 20061019

2006-10-18 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2006-09-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-09-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-09-06 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060906

2006-09-06 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060906

2006-09-06 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060906

2006-09-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060906

2006-09-06 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060906

2006-09-06 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060906

2002-01-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011218

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010219

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE