Global Patent Index - EP 1100857 A1

EP 1100857 A1 2001-05-23 - USE OF SURFACE ACTIVE AGENTS TO REDUCE SCUM IN FABRIC CARE COMPOSITIONS

Title (en)

USE OF SURFACE ACTIVE AGENTS TO REDUCE SCUM IN FABRIC CARE COMPOSITIONS

Title (de)

vERWENDUNG VON OBERFLÄCHENAKTIVEN SUBSTANZEN ZUR SCUM-REDUZIERUNG IN GEWEBEPFLEGEMITTEL

Title (fr)

UTILISATION D'AGENTS TENSIOACTIVE POUR REDUIR SCUM DAND DES COMPOSITIONS POUR LE SOIN DES TISSUS

Publication

EP 1100857 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98938209 A

Priority

US 9815955 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0006680A1] The present invention is a fabric care composition comprising a nitrogen containing compound selected from a polyamino-functional polymer, a dye fixing agent, and mixtures thereof, and a scum reducing agent selected from a water-soluble cationic surface active agent; a polyoxyalkylene alkyl amine surface active agent, and mixtures thereof, whereby the composition exhibit reduced or even no scum formation on fabric and/or washing machine parts compared to compositions which do not comprise the scum reducing agent.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/37; C11D 1/44; C11D 1/62; C11D 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06L 1/12 (2006.01); C08K 5/00 (2006.01); C08K 5/19 (2006.01); C08L 71/02 (2006.01); C08L 79/02 (2006.01); C08L 101/02 (2006.01); C11D 1/44 (2006.01); C11D 1/62 (2006.01); C11D 3/00 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01); C11D 10/02 (2006.01); D06M 13/463 (2006.01); D06M 15/61 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/44 (2013.01); C11D 1/62 (2013.01); C11D 3/001 (2013.01); C11D 3/3723 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0006680A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0006680 A1 20000210; AT 486924 T 20101115; AU 8678898 A 20000221; BR 9815974 A 20011009; CA 2336398 A1 20000210; CZ 20010007 A3 20020116; CZ 302973 B6 20120201; DE 69841985 D1 20101216; EP 1100857 A1 20010523; EP 1100857 B1 20101103; ES 2355796 T3 20110331; JP 2002521583 A 20020716; ZA 9904687 B 20000131

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170726

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170725

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-09-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170712

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170613

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-06-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-11-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130801

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-05-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110731

2013-05-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20101103

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120712

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120720

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-07-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-04-25 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2011-12-01 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 69841985

- Effective date: 20110804

2011-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110729

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-10-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110804

2011-08-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20101103

2011-07-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20101103

2011-06-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110204

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20101103

2011-05-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20101103

2011-05-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110303

2011-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20101103

2011-03-31 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2355796 T3

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-02-23 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2010-12-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69841985 P 20101216

2010-12-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2010-11-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOHEST AG

2010-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2010-11-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2010-11-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2010-05-26 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: USE OF SURFACE ACTIVE AGENTS TO REDUCE SCUM IN FABRIC CARE COMPOSITIONS

2005-04-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050301

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010115

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE