Global Patent Index - EP 1100885 A1

EP 1100885 A1 2001-05-23 - RAPID SUBCLONING USING SITE-SPECIFIC RECOMBINATION

Title (en)

RAPID SUBCLONING USING SITE-SPECIFIC RECOMBINATION

Title (de)

SCHNELLE SUBKLONIERUNG MITTELS ORTSSPEZIFISCHER REKOMBINATION

Title (fr)

SOUS-CLONAGE RAPIDE FAISANT APPEL A UNE RECOMBINAISON SPECIFIQUE A UN SITE

Publication

EP 1100885 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98937141 A

Priority

  • US 9815481 W
  • US 12238498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0005355A1] The present invention provides compositions, including vectors, and methods for the rapid subcloning of nucleic acid sequences in vivo and in vitro. In particular, the invention provides vectors used to contain a gene of interest that comprise a sequence-specific recombinase target site. These vectors are used to rapidly transfer the gene or genes of interest into any vector that contains a sequence-specific recombinase target site located downstream of a regulatory element so that the gene of interest may be regulated.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/00; C12N 15/09; C12N 15/63; C12P 21/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/66 (2006.01); C12N 15/90 (2006.01); C40B 40/02 (2006.01); C40B 50/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/905 (2013.01); C12N 15/66 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0005355 A1 20000203; AU 8592298 A 20000214; CA 2336520 A1 20000203; EP 1100885 A1 20010523; EP 1100885 A4 20011212; JP 2002522013 A 20020723

INPADOC legal status


2007-05-30 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20070413

2004-09-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040730

2001-12-12 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ELLEDGE, STEPHEN, J.,DR.

2001-08-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LIU, QINGHUA

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010214

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE