Global Patent Index - EP 1100902 A1

EP 1100902 A1 2001-05-23 - KERATINOCYTE DERIVED INTERFERON

Title (en)

KERATINOCYTE DERIVED INTERFERON

Title (de)

INTERFERON VON KERATINOZYTEN

Title (fr)

INTERFERON DERIVE DE KERATINOCYTE

Publication

EP 1100902 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99935752 A

Priority

  • US 9916424 W
  • US 9364398 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0005371A1] The present invention relates to a novel KDI protein which is a member of the interferon family. In particular, isolated nucleic acid molecules are provided encoding a human interferon polypeptide, called "KDI". KDI polypeptides are also provided as are vectors, host cells and recombinant methods for producing the same. The invention further relates to screening methods for identifying agonists and antagonists of KDI activity. Also provided are therapeutic methods for treating immune system-related disorders.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 38/21 (2006.01); A61P 31/04 (2006.01); A61P 31/12 (2006.01); A61P 33/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/08 (2006.01); C07K 14/555 (2006.01); C07K 16/24 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/12 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/555 (2013.01); C10M 145/36 (2013.01); C10M 145/38 (2013.01); C10M 173/02 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); C10M 2209/108 (2013.01); C10M 2209/109 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0005371 A1 20000203; AU 5116199 A 20000214; AU 765890 B2 20031002; CA 2335655 A1 20000203; CN 1319137 A 20011024; EP 1100902 A1 20010523; EP 1100902 A4 20040929; JP 2002522021 A 20020723; NZ 509402 A 20030829

INPADOC legal status


2010-02-26 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1038037

2008-12-24 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080708

2008-03-05 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2006-09-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041227

2005-02-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041227

2004-09-29 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040811

2004-06-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12N 15/12 A

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010221

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI