Global Patent Index - EP 1100984 A1

EP 1100984 A1 2001-05-23 - INSTALLATION AND METHOD FOR MULTILAYERED IMMERSION COATING

Title (en)

INSTALLATION AND METHOD FOR MULTILAYERED IMMERSION COATING

Title (de)

ANLAGE UND VERFAHREN ZUM MEHRFACHBESCHICHTEN DURCH TAUCHEN

Title (fr)

INSTALLATION ET PROCEDE DE MULTICOUCHAGE PAR IMMERSION

Publication

EP 1100984 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99941474 A

Priority

  • DE 19834245 A
  • EP 9905410 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19834245A1] A method for multilayered coating, whereby hurdles for the item that is to be treated are guided for galavanic dip coating (2) through a tank in a separate circuit. Downstream from the tank, the hurdles are changed over (12) and the item that is to be treated is guided in another hurdle for electrophoretic coating through a tank (4) in another separate circuit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C25D 17/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C25D 17/00 (2006.01); B65G 49/04 (2006.01); C23C 22/73 (2006.01); C25D 13/00 (2006.01); C25D 17/06 (2006.01); C25D 17/08 (2006.01); C25D 17/28 (2006.01); C25D 19/00 (2006.01); C25D 21/00 (2006.01); C25D 13/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65G 49/0463 (2013.01); B65G 49/0427 (2013.01); C25D 11/005 (2013.01); C25D 13/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0006810A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19834245 A1 20000203; DE 19834245 B4 20070503; AU 5507699 A 20000221; BR 9913344 A 20010515; CA 2338971 A1 20000210; CZ 20010335 A3 20010815; EP 1100984 A1 20010523; EP 1724377 A1 20061122; HU 0103402 A2 20011228; HU 0103402 A3 20020228; HU 225207 B1 20060828; JP 2002521574 A 20020716; MX PA01002189 A 20040514; PL 189768 B1 20050930; PL 345779 A1 20020102; TR 200100920 T2 20010723; US 6565722 B1 20030520; WO 0006810 A1 20000210

INPADOC legal status


2008-03-19 [R18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20080126

2008-03-12 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080126

2002-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020314

2002-04-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: WALTER HILLEBRAND GMBH & CO. GALVANOTECHNIK

2002-04-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NUETRO MASCHINEN- UND ANLAGENBAU GMBH & CO. KG

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010227

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI PAYMENT 20010227