Global Patent Index - EP 1101000 A1

EP 1101000 A1 2001-05-23 - DEVICE FOR RINSING DRAINS

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR RINSING DRAINS

Title (de)

KANALSPÜLER

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE LAVAGE DE CANALISATIONS

Publication

EP 1101000 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99938364 A

Priority

  • DE 19834328 A
  • DE 19918323 A
  • DE 19919571 A
  • EP 9905411 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0006844A1] The present invention relates to a device for rinsing drains, comprising a collector chamber (1) for a rinsing liquid with a rinsing opening (3) that opens out onto the drain that is to be rinsed, an overflow chamber (6) that is joined to the collector chamber (1) via an overflow opening (5), and a closing member (7). When said closing member is in a closed position, it seals the rinsing opening (3) and the overflow opening (5). When the overflow chamber (6) is full, said closing member floats and releases both openings (3, 5). The inventive device for rinsing drains is characterised in that the opening (5) of the overflow chamber is located above the rinsing opening in the lower area of the overflow chamber (6), whereby the outflowing rinsing liquid also rinses the overflow chamber (6) and the opening (5) of the overflow chamber in addition to flowing out of the overflow chamber (6) entirely. This results in a reliably and hydraulically effective device requiring only a limited amount of maintenance.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03F 9/00; B08B 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B08B 9/02 (2006.01); E03F 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B08B 9/032 (2013.01); E03F 9/00 (2013.01); E03F 9/007 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0006844A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0006844 A1 20000210; AT 245737 T 20030815; EP 1101000 A1 20010523; EP 1101000 B1 20030723; PL 190178 B1 20051130; PL 345778 A1 20020102

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150728

2016-03-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 245737 T

- Effective date: 20150728

2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140731

2015-04-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150331

2014-11-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140630

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130719

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100728

2011-03-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100728

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090722

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-07-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040426

2004-05-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-02-25 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2003-11-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031105

2003-08-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT FR GB

2003-07-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001218

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE