Global Patent Index - EP 1101001 A1

EP 1101001 A1 2001-05-23 - Device for holding and HOLDING RAIL FOR HOLDING GLASS PROFILE ELEMENTS

Title (en)

Device for holding and HOLDING RAIL FOR HOLDING GLASS PROFILE ELEMENTS

Title (de)

Haltevorrichtung und HALTESCHIENE ZUM HALTEN VON GLASPROFILELEMENTEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR RETENIR DES ELEMENTS PROFILES EN VERRE et rail de support

Publication

EP 1101001 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00947765 A

Priority

  • DE 0001709 W
  • DE 29909184 U
  • DE 29914926 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6668500B1] The invention relates to a holding device for holding glass closures (20) formed by individual glass profile elements, especially U-shaped glass profile elements (21, 21'), or other long glass elements, especially insulating glass elements. In order to prevent water condensation inside the glass closure (20), the holding device comprises at least one holding rail (2; 32, 36, 37; 34, 64, 65; 34, 64', 76; 79; 80) for holding or mounting and for laterally guiding and supporting the individual long glass elements or glass profile elements (21, 21') or the glass closure (20). Said holding rail (2; 32, 36, 37; 34, 64, 65; 34, 64', 76; 79; 80) has a metal holding segment (3; 38; 54; 69, 77; 87; 88) for holding or supporting a front face area or a partial front face area of the glass closure (20) or individual glass elements or glass profile elements (21, 21') at least one projecting metal flange section (4, 5; 4', 5'; 49, 50; 57, 58; 71, 72; 81, 82) for laterally guiding or supporting the glass closure (20) and/or one, several or all the individual glass elements or glass profile elements (21, 21') thereof, whereby the flange segment (4, 5; 4', 5'; 49, 50; 57, 58; 71, 72; 81, 82) and the holding segment (3; 38; 54; 69, 77; 87; 88) are fixedly connected to one another by means of a heat-insulating and/or thermally separating connecting device (6, 7; 40, 41; 43, 44; 45, 46, 47, 48; 67, 68; 64, 65). The invention also relates to a holding rail that can be used in said holding device.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04C 2/54; E06B 3/263

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/263 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/26343 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0075452A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6668500 B1 20031230; AT 260385 T 20040315; DE 10081553 D2 20011004; EP 1101001 A1 20010523; EP 1101001 B1 20040225; WO 0075452 A1 20001214; WO 0075452 A8 20040422; WO 0075452 A9 20020906

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161201

2016-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50005402

2016-03-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50005402

- Representative's name: KASTEL PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2016-01-27 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50005402

- Representative's name: KASTEL, STEFAN, DIPL.-PHYS.UNIV., DE

2016-01-27 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50005402

- Representative's name: KASTEL PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150529

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-03-27 [27C] TERMINATION OF OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Effective date: 20121119

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080602

2009-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090119

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070526

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070529

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-02-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-02-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070526

2008-02-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071201

2008-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071201

2008-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070526

2008-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040725

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: GLASFABRIK *LAMBERTS G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20070531

2006-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-05-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060530

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-05-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060529

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-05-19 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060519

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: BAUGLASINDUSTRIE GMBH

2005-01-19 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: BAUGLASINDUSTRIE GMBH

- Effective date: 20041124

2004-10-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-09-22 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-07-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040628

2004-06-05 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040605

2004-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-05-26 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040526

2004-05-25 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040525

2004-05-25 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040525

2004-05-25 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040525

2004-04-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50005402 P 20040401

2004-03-24 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-02-27 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-02-27 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSBUERO EDER AG

2004-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-02-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-02-25 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040225

2004-02-25 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040225

2004-02-25 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040225

2004-02-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040225

2003-10-08 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DEVICE FOR HOLDING AND HOLDING RAIL FOR HOLDING GLASS PROFILE ELEMENTS

2003-07-23 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DEVICE FOR HOLDING AND HOLDING RAIL FOR HOLDING GLASS PROFILE ELEMENTS

2003-04-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030310

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010205

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE