Global Patent Index - EP 1101005 A1

EP 1101005 A1 2001-05-23 - A SECURITY SYSTEM

Title (en)

A SECURITY SYSTEM

Title (de)

SICHERHEITSSYSTEM

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE SECURITE

Publication

EP 1101005 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99928063 A

Priority

  • GB 9901943 W
  • GB 9816409 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0006858A1] A security system is disclosed in which a security control unit (12) transmits a coded signal component (S1) at a first frequency (F1) to a remote transponder unit (14). The security signal has two components (S1, S2) which are transmitted at different frequencies (F1, F2) and the frequency of transmission of the second signal component (F2) is encoded in the first signal component (S1). The remote unit (14) is arranged to decode the frequency (F2) of the second signal component (S2) from the first signal component (S1) and therefrom to tune itself to receive the second signal component (S2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 49/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07C 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07C 9/00309 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00555 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00793 (2013.01); G07C 2209/61 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0006858A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0006858 A1 20000210; AU 4519099 A 20000221; DE 69920233 D1 20041021; DE 69920233 T2 20051124; EP 1101005 A1 20010523; EP 1101005 B1 20040915; GB 9816409 D0 19980923

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090617

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090617

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-03-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100226

2010-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090617

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090101

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080626

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080626

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080625

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-07-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070724

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-09-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050616

2005-04-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-10-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69920233 P 20041021

2004-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-09-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-10-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030825

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001209

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT