Global Patent Index - EP 1101033 A2

EP 1101033 A2 2001-05-23 - FUEL INJECTOR FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES

Title (en)

FUEL INJECTOR FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES

Title (de)

KRAFTSTOFFEINSPRITZVENTIL FÜR BRENNKRAFTMASCHINEN

Title (fr)

SOUPAPE D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT POUR MOTEURS A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 1101033 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99950475 A

Priority

  • DE 9902352 W
  • DE 19834668 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0006892A2] According to the invention a choke element embodied as a choke plate (400) is axially clamped between a valve element (300) and an intermediate element (500) or nozzle element (510). The choke plate presents a fuel channel (410) which via an inlet channel (420) is connected with a control chamber (540) which in turn is connected with a servo valve (340) via an outlet channel (440). Together with their axially adjacent elements the faces of the choke plate (400) form a highly pressure-resistant seal. According to a further embodiment of the invention the inlet channel (420) is curved in a circular manner and discharges vertically into the fuel channel (410) so as to render the choke plate (400) highly pressure resistant. The curved inlet channel is produced using an erosion method.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 47/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/027 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0006892A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0006892 A2 20000210; WO 0006892 A3 20000602; EP 1101033 A2 20010523; EP 1101033 B1 20021002

INPADOC legal status


2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-04-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59902966

- Effective date: 20140201

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120731

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-12-28 [R26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20030703

2011-12-28 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: VOIGT, ANDREAS

2011-12-28 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: LEWENTZ, GUENTER

2011-12-28 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: FITZNER, JOHANNES

2011-12-28 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: RINK, JUERGEN

2011-12-28 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: SCHMUTZLER, GERD

2011-12-28 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: BARANOWSKI, DIRK

2011-12-28 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: GIAVI, RAIMONDO

2011-12-28 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: LEHMANN, STEFAN

2006-05-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2004-07-16 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040716

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-09-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030703

2003-08-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1101033E

2003-04-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-11-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902966 20021107

2002-10-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2001-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010702

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001123

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE