Global Patent Index - EP 1101039 A1

EP 1101039 A1 2001-05-23 - HYDRO-TRANSFORMER

Title (en)

HYDRO-TRANSFORMER

Title (de)

HYDRO-TRANSFORMATOR

Title (fr)

HYDROTRANSFORMATEUR

Publication

EP 1101039 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99948659 A

Priority

  • DE 9902238 W
  • DE 19835676 A
  • DE 19844648 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6499295B1] The present invention relates to a hydro-transformer including a hydraulic machine, a switching valve and a control means. A work port of the switching valve, which may optionally be connected hydraulically with a pressure port of the switching valve or a drain port of the switching valve, is connected with a first port of the hydraulic machine. The second port of the hydraulic machine is in hydraulic connection with a drive member. The switching valve is driven by the control means in response to a signal characterizing the volume flow into the hydraulic machine. Where the driver member is a cylinder, its extension may be carried out at a constant velocity and independently of a load, and energy may be recovered upon retraction. Due to the provision of a further switching valve between the second part of the hydrostatic motor and the drive member, a higher pressure may be generated at the drive member in the presence of a low pressure at the pressure port of the switching valve.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 11/05; F15B 21/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 1/02 (2006.01); F15B 11/028 (2006.01); F15B 11/05 (2006.01); F15B 21/08 (2006.01); F15B 21/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 1/02 (2013.01); F15B 11/055 (2013.01); F15B 21/087 (2013.01); F15B 21/14 (2013.01); F15B 2211/212 (2013.01); F15B 2211/214 (2013.01); F15B 2211/30525 (2013.01); F15B 2211/3059 (2013.01); F15B 2211/3122 (2013.01); F15B 2211/6313 (2013.01); F15B 2211/632 (2013.01); F15B 2211/6336 (2013.01); F15B 2211/665 (2013.01); F15B 2211/6654 (2013.01); F15B 2211/7052 (2013.01); F15B 2211/7058 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0008339A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6499295 B1 20021231; EP 1101039 A1 20010523; EP 1101039 B1 20021211; JP 2002522710 A 20020723; WO 0008339 A1 20000217

INPADOC legal status


2012-05-16 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59903771

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120201

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100924

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070720

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070720

2008-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070720

2006-07-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060731

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-07-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060721

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-04-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2003-12-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030912

2003-08-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1101039E

2003-08-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030218

2003-01-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903771 20030123

2003-01-22 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-12-18 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BOSCH REXROTH AG

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-12-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MANNESMANN REXROTH AG

2002-03-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020212

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010206

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE