Global Patent Index - EP 1101042 A1

EP 1101042 A1 2001-05-23 - HEAT-BONDED END PIECE

Title (en)

HEAT-BONDED END PIECE

Title (de)

VERSCHWEISSTER VERSCHLEISSSENSOR UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

EMBOUT D'USURE THERMO-SOUDE

Publication

EP 1101042 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00940467 A

Priority

  • FR 0001581 W
  • FR 9907186 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0075526A1] The invention concerns a wear detecting device for friction lining, in particular a brake pad, designed to be inserted in an orifice provided therefor in a friction lining or fixed to a mounting plate bearing said lining, comprising a hollow end piece (1, 2, 3) and a sheathed electrical conducting wire (30) fitted into said end piece. The end piece (1, 2, 3) is heat-bonded on the electrical conducting wire sheath (32).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16D 66/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16D 66/02 (2006.01); H01R 4/72 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F16D 66/024 (2013.01); H01R 4/72 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0075526A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0075526 A1 20001214; WO 0075526 A9 20010607; AU 5540100 A 20001228; CZ 20010494 A3 20010711; CZ 296613 B6 20060517; DE 1101042 T1 20020207; EP 1101042 A1 20010523; ES 2157188 T1 20010816; FR 2795470 A1 20001229; FR 2795470 B1 20010810; PL 345827 A1 20020114; SK 1772001 A3 20011106

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130103

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT PT

2002-02-07 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

2001-08-16 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2157188 T1

2001-08-08 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010518

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI