Global Patent Index - EP 1101074 A1

EP 1101074 A1 2001-05-23 - DRYER AND METHOD FOR DRYING CONTINUOUSLY CONVEYED PRODUCTS

Title (en)

DRYER AND METHOD FOR DRYING CONTINUOUSLY CONVEYED PRODUCTS

Title (de)

TROCKNER UND VERFAHREN ZUM TROCKNEN VON KONTINUIERLICH GEFÖRDERTER WARE

Title (fr)

SECHEUR ET PROCEDE DE SECHAGE DE PRODUITS ACHEMINES EN CONTINU

Publication

EP 1101074 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00936780 A

Priority

  • EP 00936780 A
  • EP 0004657 W
  • EP 99201682 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1055895A1] The dryer has mutually relatively movable first and second drying arrangements (2,3) with a passage (4) for the goods (W) between them. The drying arrangements can be moved so that the passage has a greater cross-section in a first position, esp. a stopped position for the dryer, than in a second position, esp. an operating position. An Independent claim is also included for a method of stopping or temporarily interrupting the drying process.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F26B 13/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F26B 13/00 (2006.01); F26B 13/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F26B 13/10 (2013.01); F26B 13/001 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0073720A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1055895 A1 20001129; AU 5215400 A 20001218; BR 0006157 A 20010417; CZ 20010324 A3 20011212; DE 50011621 D1 20051222; EP 1101074 A1 20010523; EP 1101074 B1 20051116; ES 2253229 T3 20060601; JP 2003532855 A 20031105; US 6557268 B1 20030506; WO 0073720 A1 20001207

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090519

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090520

2010-07-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090520

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090602

2010-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100129

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080417

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080423

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080409

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080415

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-10-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060817

2006-07-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2253229 T3

2005-12-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50011621 P 20051222

2005-11-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2005-05-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MENSING, HEINRICH

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010118

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI