Global Patent Index - EP 1101075 A1

EP 1101075 A1 2001-05-23 - SELF-DEFENCE DEVICE

Title (en)

SELF-DEFENCE DEVICE

Title (de)

SELBSTVERTEIDIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

SYSTEME D'AUTODEFENSE

Publication

EP 1101075 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99930984 A

Priority

  • CH 9900350 W
  • CH 158498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0006965A1] The invention relates to a self-defence device (70) comprising at least two barrels (72a-d) which each contain a firing charge (74, 76, 75) each comprising an electrically ignited initial igniter (75) and a propelling charge (76) and an active charge (74), as well as a release mechanism (87) having a piezoelectric high-voltage pulse source (99) and a change-over switch (88). Via the change-over switch (88) one initial igniter (75) at a time can be electrically coupled to the high-voltage pulse source (99) for ignition. The release mechanism (87) has a trigger element (89) which when manually actuated acts on the high-voltage pulse source (99) such that a high-voltage pulse is generated. The change-over switch (88) is configured such that it can independently establish an electrical connection to one as yet unfired initial igniter (75) without the influence of the ignited propelling charge (76) or to a battery element. The above self-defence device is discreet in appearance, robust and easy to handle. It is recognizable as a weapon only on closer inspection. It requires no maintenance and remains operational for a period of several years.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41A 19/62; F41A 19/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41B 15/00 (2006.01); F41A 19/62 (2006.01); F41A 19/68 (2006.01); F41H 9/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41H 9/10 (2013.01); F41A 19/62 (2013.01); F41A 19/68 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0006965A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0006965 A1 20000210; AU 4767299 A 20000221; BR 9912557 A 20010502; DE 59904283 D1 20030320; EP 1101075 A1 20010523; EP 1101075 B1 20030212; JP 2002521645 A 20020716

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-16 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040727

2005-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050201

2004-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040727

2004-02-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031113

2003-09-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030926

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-08-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-06-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030630

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-06-20 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030620

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-06-18 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030618

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-03-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59904283 P 20030320

2003-03-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030212

2003-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KELLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2003-02-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-02-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2003-02-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011119

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010126

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI