Global Patent Index - EP 1101077 A1

EP 1101077 A1 2001-05-23 - AMMUNITION CONTAINER

Title (en)

AMMUNITION CONTAINER

Title (de)

MUNITIONSBEHÄLTER

Title (fr)

CONTENEUR A MUNITIONS

Publication

EP 1101077 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99930983 A

Priority

  • CH 9900349 W
  • CH 158198 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0006967A1] The invention relates to an ammunition container (1) which is configured in a special manner and comprises a stackable outer container (2) which in the area of a hinged lid (15) has a reinforcing frame (20). The reinforcing frame (20) rises above the hinge lid (15) and its closing lever (16). The ammunition container (1) further has an internal packaging system (8) comprising an adapter element (12) and an inner sleeve (10). The adapter element (12) cooperates with the inner sleeve (10) in the manner of a locking mechanism and makes it possible to introduce an item of ammunition (7) in a simple manner, to secure it in its packaged position (S) and to remove it again.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 39/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 39/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 39/00 (2013.01); F42B 39/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0006967A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0006967 A1 20000210; DE 59903192 D1 20021128; EP 1101077 A1 20010523; EP 1101077 B1 20021023; IL 138046 D0 20011031; US 6357582 B1 20020319

INPADOC legal status


2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110727

2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110801

2012-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-04-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120330

2012-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110727

2012-02-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *MULLER A.G. VERPACKUNGEN

- Effective date: 20110731

2011-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20100714

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100721

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100715

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-10-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20100705

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-07-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ADRESSAENDERUNG

- Representative's name: HANS ULRICH SEIFERT SEIFERT UND PARTNER

2006-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060201

2004-08-06 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040806

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-10-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030724

2003-06-25 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1101077E

2003-05-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-12-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: HANS ULRICH SEIFERT FELBER SEIFERT & PARTNER

2002-11-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903192 20021128

2002-11-13 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB LI

2002-10-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-03-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020206

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001113

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE