Global Patent Index - EP 1101152 A1

EP 1101152 A1 2001-05-23 - SEPARATION FINGERS FOR ELECTRO PHOTOGRAPHIC DEVICES

Title (en)

SEPARATION FINGERS FOR ELECTRO PHOTOGRAPHIC DEVICES

Title (de)

TRENNFINGER FÜR ELEKTROFOTOGRAFISCHE GERÄTE

Title (fr)

DOIGTS SEPARATEURS DESTINES A DES DISPOSITIFS ELECTROPHOTOGRAPHIQUES

Publication

EP 1101152 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99937676 A

Priority

  • JP 21600098 A
  • US 9917333 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0007074A1] This invention relates to a separation finger used in an Electro photographic device such as photocopying devices and laser-beam printers. More specifically, it relates to a separation finger with remarkably improved durability which has a sharp tip and is capable of preventing paper jams, caused by, for example, adhesion of the toner, over extended periods of time.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 15/00; G03G 15/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/14 (2006.01); C08L 27/18 (2006.01); C08L 79/08 (2006.01); G03G 15/00 (2006.01); G03G 15/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/6532 (2013.01); G03G 15/2028 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0007074A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0007074 A1 20000210; CA 2337523 A1 20000210; CA 2337523 C 20071204; CN 1146759 C 20040421; CN 1311874 A 20010905; DE 69915489 D1 20040415; DE 69915489 T2 20050303; EP 1101152 A1 20010523; EP 1101152 B1 20040310; JP 2000047493 A 20000218

INPADOC legal status


2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69915489

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130201

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110727

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100729

2011-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100802

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100729

2011-04-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-03-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100729

2011-02-16 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110201

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090724

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090729

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090705

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090710

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-05-04 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2005-03-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041213

2004-12-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-04-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69915489 P 20040415

2004-04-07 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2003-03-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010104

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE