Global Patent Index - EP 1101180 A1

EP 1101180 A1 2001-05-23 - A METHOD AND AN APPARATUS FOR A UNIVERSAL TRADING MARKET DESIGN AND DEPLOYMENT SYSTEM

Title (en)

A METHOD AND AN APPARATUS FOR A UNIVERSAL TRADING MARKET DESIGN AND DEPLOYMENT SYSTEM

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND GERÄT FÜR UNIVERSELLES HANDELSMUSTER UND ANWENDUNGSSYSTEM

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL RELATIFS A UN SYSTEME UNIVERSEL DE CONCEPTION ET DE MISE EN OEUVRE DE MARCHES D'ECHANGES

Publication

EP 1101180 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99937641 A

Priority

  • US 9917248 W
  • US 13104898 A
  • US 33932599 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0008578A1] A universal auction specification system including a network-accessible set of trading primitives ("TPs") and a market specification console (110) that includes a script generator (121) for combining the set of TPs into a temporal protocol script representing a particular auction specification. The system further includes a programmable auction server (140) that has a plurality of modules wherein each module may have a TP.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0008578 A1 20000217; AU 5243399 A 20000228; BR 9912851 A 20011009; CA 2349913 A1 20000217; EP 1101180 A1 20010523; EP 1101180 A4 20020703; JP 2002526820 A 20020820

INPADOC legal status


2008-08-13 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080201

2008-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071203

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-07-03 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020522

2002-07-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-03-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: TRADING DYNAMICS, INC.

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010222

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE