Global Patent Index - EP 1101195 A1

EP 1101195 A1 2001-05-23 - MEASUREMENT SYSTEM

Title (en)

MEASUREMENT SYSTEM

Title (de)

MESSSYSTEM

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE MESURE

Publication

EP 1101195 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98901891 A

Priority

  • BE 9800017 W
  • BE 9700143 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9836381A1] The invention concerns a method and a device for determining the position of a point, involving the use of at least two separate cameras (1, 2) with a number of pixels to detect that point and identifiying the pixels where the image (4, 4') of the said point is detected and then calculating the position of that point on the basis of the position of the pixels so identified, assigning an address to each of the pixels of at least one camera (1, 2) and, from the pixels of that camera (1, 2), selecting a group of pixels that contains at least some of the pixels where the said image (4, 4') is detected, and which, when the said point is moved, is modified so that it continues to contain the pixels where the said image (4, 4') is detected.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06T 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06T 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06T 7/593 (2017.01); G06T 7/73 (2017.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9836381 A1 19980820; AU 5849198 A 19980908; BE 1010929 A3 19990302; EP 1101195 A1 20010523

INPADOC legal status


2012-09-19 [R17C] DATE OF DESPATCH OF FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050413

2012-08-15 [R17C] DATE OF DESPATCH OF FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050413

2009-03-25 [111L] LICENCES

- Free text: 0101 MITUTOYO CORPORATION

- Effective date: 20090202

2009-03-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: 3D SCANNERS LTD

2005-06-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050413

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991011

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE