Global Patent Index - EP 1101204 A1

EP 1101204 A1 2001-05-23 - TRANSPORT CARTS

Title (en)

TRANSPORT CARTS

Title (de)

TRANSPORTWAGEN

Title (fr)

CHARIOT DE TRANSPORT

Publication

EP 1101204 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00940211 A

Priority

  • DE 0001673 W
  • DE 19924869 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19924869A1] The invention relates to a transport cart (1) that can be pushed. Said transport cart is provided with a token-operated lock (8) and at least one device (7) that is located outside the token-operated lock (8) and is operated by electric energy. Said device (7) is supplied with electric energy via an electric circuit (14) that is fed by an energy source (6) on the transport cart (1). The invention is also characterized in that the token-operated lock (8) is integrated in the electric circuit (14) and that the electric circuit (14) is closed by the action of a switch element (12) inside the token-operated lock (8) once the token is inserted and that it is broken once the token is returned.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 7/06; B62B 3/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 7/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 7/0663 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0074005A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19924869 A1 20001130; CN 1120451 C 20030903; CN 1302420 A 20010704; EP 1101204 A1 20010523; EP 1101204 B1 20020821; ES 2181658 T3 20030301; PL 193879 B1 20070330; PL 345121 A1 20011203; WO 0074005 A1 20001207

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100523

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100522

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110705

2011-07-15 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110715

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101201

2011-02-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-01-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100522

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090528

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090531

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090519

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090522

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-08-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030522

2003-07-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1101204E

2003-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2181658 T3

2002-12-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021205

2002-12-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-02 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-09-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50000389 20020926

2002-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2002-08-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011214

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001019

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE