Global Patent Index - EP 1101222 A1

EP 1101222 A1 2001-05-23 - THE COPY PROTECTION OF DIGITAL AUDIO COMPACT DISCS

Title (en)

THE COPY PROTECTION OF DIGITAL AUDIO COMPACT DISCS

Title (de)

KOPIERSCHUTZ FÜR DIGITALE AUDIO-COMPACT-DISCS (CDS)

Title (fr)

PROTECTION CONTRE LA COPIE DE DISQUES COMPACTS NUMERIQUES AUDIO

Publication

EP 1101222 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00935336 A

Priority

  • GB 0002011 W
  • GB 9912312 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0074053A1] Digital audio compact discs (CD-DA) which carry audio can be played and read by CD-ROM drives. Thus the data on the CD-DA may be read into a computer by way of its ROM drive and copied onto another disc. The increasing availability of recorders able to write to CD's poses an enormous threat to the music industry. To copy protect a digital audio compact disc (6), where control data useable by a data reader is encoded on the disc, selected control data is rendered incorrect and/or inaccurate. The incorrect data is either inaccessible to, or not generally read by, an audio player such that a legitimate audio CD which has been copy protected can be played normally on an audio player. However, the incorrect data renders the CD unplayable by a data reader.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G11B 20/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G11B 20/10 (2006.01); G11B 20/00 (2006.01); G11B 20/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G11B 20/00956 (2013.01); G11B 20/00086 (2013.01); G11B 20/0063 (2013.01); G11B 20/00927 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0074053A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0074053 A1 20001207; AU 5088500 A 20001218; AU 773875 B2 20040610; BR 0006159 A 20010417; CA 2338826 A1 20001207; CN 1156839 C 20040707; CN 1310841 A 20010829; CN 1523600 A 20040825; EP 1101222 A1 20010523; GB 0102129 D0 20010314; GB 2355575 A 20010425; GB 2355575 B 20030723; GB 9912312 D0 19990728; HK 1037421 A1 20031024; JP 2003500789 A 20030107; JP 3405980 B2 20030512; MX PA01000950 A 20020604; NZ 509615 A 20030429; PL 345732 A1 20020102; RU 2249861 C2 20050410

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-07 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20100227

2009-05-13 [111Z] REGISTERING OF LICENCES OR OTHER RIGHTS

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LU MC NL PT

- Effective date: 20090226

2006-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060224

2004-07-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MARIJAN DOMAGOJ TORBARAC

2002-10-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MACROVISION CORPORATION

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010202

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI