Global Patent Index - EP 1101229 A1

EP 1101229 A1 2001-05-23 - MAGNETIC CORE INSULATION

Title (en)

MAGNETIC CORE INSULATION

Title (de)

ISOLIERTER MAGNETKERN

Title (fr)

ISOLATION DE NOYAU MAGNETIQUE

Publication

EP 1101229 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00937588 A

Priority

  • US 0013590 W
  • US 31554999 A
  • US 14120999 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0072334A1] Disclosed herein is an insulating material between adjacent metal layers of a soft magnetic core, and a process for forming this insulating material. The insulating material is composed of the native metal oxides of the metallic core material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 1/18; C21D 8/12; H01F 1/153; H01F 41/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23C 8/02 (2006.01); C23C 8/10 (2006.01); C23C 26/00 (2006.01); C23C 28/00 (2006.01); H01F 1/153 (2006.01); H01F 1/18 (2006.01); H01F 41/02 (2006.01); C21D 8/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 41/02 (2013.01); C23C 8/02 (2013.01); C23C 8/10 (2013.01); C23C 26/00 (2013.01); H01F 1/15333 (2013.01); H01F 1/15383 (2013.01); H01F 1/18 (2013.01); C21D 8/1283 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0072334A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0072334 A1 20001130; AU 5273600 A 20001212; CA 2337653 A1 20001130; EP 1101229 A1 20010523; JP 2003500850 A 20030107; TW 508595 B 20021101

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20081202

2004-03-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040120

2003-08-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NAM ACQUIRING CORP.

2001-09-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WOOD, RICHARD

2001-09-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LATHLAEN, RICHARD

2001-09-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BECKHAM, WILLIAM

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010214

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI