Global Patent Index - EP 1101231 A1

EP 1101231 A1 2001-05-23 - ELECTRIC SWITCH

Title (en)

ELECTRIC SWITCH

Title (de)

ELEKTRISCHER SCHALTER

Title (fr)

COMMUTATEUR ELECTRIQUE

Publication

EP 1101231 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99963151 A

Priority

  • DE 9902151 W
  • DE 19833296 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19930558A1] A switch contact, fitted to a slide (7) moved between two positions by an actuating mechanism, moves away from a fixed contact (5) in position one but makes contact with it in position two. An elastic mechanism, designed as an primary spring (10) fitted on the slide like an action point spring, operates on moving the slide with a shift point connecting link. An elastic force acts against the slide's movement up to a change-over point reached while passing the action point.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 15/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 15/18 (2006.01); H01H 19/635 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 15/18 (2013.01); H01H 9/06 (2013.01); H01H 19/635 (2013.01); H01H 2300/048 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0007201A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19930558 A1 20000127; CN 1123024 C 20031001; CN 1310850 A 20010829; EP 1101231 A1 20010523; EP 1101231 B1 20020410; ES 2176041 T3 20021116; JP 2002521800 A 20020716; JP 4424853 B2 20100303; US 6469268 B1 20021022; WO 0007201 A1 20000210

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170731

2018-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170801

2018-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170731

2018-03-07 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170801

2018-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170823

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160725

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160720

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: EIGERSTRASSE 2 POSTFACH, 3000 BERN 14 (CH)

2003-04-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030113

2002-12-11 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1101231E

2002-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2176041 T3

2002-06-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KELLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2002-05-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59901210 20020516

2002-05-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES IT LI NL

2001-10-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010913

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001216

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE