Global Patent Index - EP 1101233 A1

EP 1101233 A1 2001-05-23 - SWITCHING DEVICE WITH HOUSING BOTTOM AS A SUB-ASSEMBLY AND CORRESPONDING PRODUCTION METHOD

Title (en)

SWITCHING DEVICE WITH HOUSING BOTTOM AS A SUB-ASSEMBLY AND CORRESPONDING PRODUCTION METHOD

Title (de)

SCHALTGERÄT MIT EINEM GEHÄUSEUNTERTEIL ALS BAUEINHEIT UND ZUGEHÖRIGES FERTIGUNGSVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

APPAREIL DE COMMUTATION COMPORTANT UNE PARTIE INFERIEURE DE BOITIER COMME ELEMENT CONSTITUTIF, ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION CORRESPONDANT

Publication

EP 1101233 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99947237 A

Priority

  • DE 9902231 W
  • DE 19833728 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0007203A1] The invention relates to a switching device with a housing bottom (1), wherein a stationary iron core (2) and a coil (4) of an electromagnet serving as switch actuator are embedded in a casting compound (9) serving as housing. Optionally, a flow sensor (5) and control electronics (6) may be potted with the casting compound. The housing bottom (1) can be produced in a cost-effective manner using a mold to position the components.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 50/36; H01H 50/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 50/36 (2006.01); H01H 50/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 50/44 (2013.01); H01H 50/36 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0007203A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0007203 A1 20000210; CN 1169177 C 20040929; CN 1307727 A 20010808; EP 1101233 A1 20010523; EP 1101233 B1 20020220

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100331

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080715

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080919

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-07-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050716

2003-02-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021121

2002-10-02 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2002-08-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-03-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900886 20020328

2002-02-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2001-09-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010719

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001122

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE