Global Patent Index - EP 1101253 A1

EP 1101253 A1 2001-05-23 - ANTENNA WITH A LARGE BANDWIDTH

Title (en)

ANTENNA WITH A LARGE BANDWIDTH

Title (de)

ANTENNE MIT GROSSER BANDBREITE

Title (fr)

ANTENNE A GRANDE LARGEUR DE BANDE

Publication

EP 1101253 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99952261 A

Priority

  • DE 9902403 W
  • DE 19835878 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19835878A1] The present invention relates to an antenna (1) for transmitting and receiving signals. The inventive antenna comprises a first antenna element (2) for transmitting and receiving signals of a given frequency, whereby said antenna element is shaped like a spiral and is capacitively coupled to a high frequency counter-weight. The inventive antenna also comprises at least one second antenna element (2), whereby said antenna elements (2) are arranged in a parallel position. The inventive antenna provides increased effective bandwidth and offers improved adaptation to the high frequency counter-weight or supply line system.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 1/36; H01Q 11/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/36 (2006.01); H01Q 5/45 (2015.01); H01Q 21/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 21/28 (2013.01); H01Q 1/362 (2013.01); H01Q 5/45 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0008711A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19835878 A1 20000217; CN 1312965 A 20010912; EP 1101253 A1 20010523; EP 1101253 B1 20020424; US 2001050655 A1 20011213; US 6404406 B2 20020611; WO 0008711 A1 20000217

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030802

2003-08-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030802

2003-06-06 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030127

2003-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030301

2002-12-11 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1101253E

2002-10-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-08-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020718

2002-06-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-05-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59901312 20020529

2002-04-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-04-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010802

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001206

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE