Global Patent Index - EP 1101255 A1

EP 1101255 A1 2001-05-23 - BATTERY TERMINAL CONNECTION CABLE

Title (en)

BATTERY TERMINAL CONNECTION CABLE

Title (de)

BATTERIEPOLANSCHLUSSKABEL

Title (fr)

CABLE DE CONNEXION POUR COSSE DE BATTERIE

Publication

EP 1101255 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99950447 A

Priority

  • DE 9902323 W
  • DE 19834792 A
  • DE 19906088 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6719595B1] According to the invention, an at least partially insulated strand of a battery terminal connection cable is either welded to a contact piece using ultrasound or is welded with a contact piece. As a result, the contact piece can be fastened onto the battery terminal using a conventional screw without worrying about the screw becoming loose. The battery terminal connection cable can be produced in an easy and at least partially automated manner using a device which comprises a sonotrode, a strand feed device, a contact piece feed device, and a pressure cylinder.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 9/03; H01R 4/02; H01R 43/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 11/12 (2006.01); H01M 2/20 (2006.01); H01R 4/02 (2006.01); H01R 9/03 (2006.01); H01R 43/02 (2006.01); H01R 11/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 43/0207 (2013.01); H01R 4/023 (2013.01); H01R 4/029 (2013.01); H01R 9/03 (2013.01); H01R 11/281 (2013.01); H01R 12/59 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0008718A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6719595 B1 20040413; AT 206250 T 20011015; AU 6323999 A 20000228; CN 1143410 C 20040324; CN 1314016 A 20010919; DE 19906088 A1 20000203; DE 19981517 D2 20010809; DE 59900287 D1 20011031; EP 1101255 A1 20010523; EP 1101255 B1 20010926; ES 2162521 T3 20011216; JP 2003505822 A 20030212; PL 196506 B1 20080131; PL 345798 A1 20020102; WO 0008718 A1 20000217

INPADOC legal status


2007-03-13 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

2006-12-18 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20061218

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-12-06 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20060921

2006-12-06 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free text: 20060921

2006-09-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060929

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-07-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060731

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-07-18 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050718

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-07-18 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050718

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-07-13 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050713

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-02-01 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030201

2003-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *FROHLICH BERNHARD

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-08-14 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: TECHMO S.A./ SOCIETE FONDERIE LEMER

- Effective date: 20020618

2002-08-14 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SCHUNK ULTRASCHALLTECHNIK GMBH

- Effective date: 20020620

2002-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020730

2002-07-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020730

2002-05-29 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2002-03-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-02-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011201

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-28 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011228

2001-12-26 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011226

2001-12-26 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011226

2001-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2162521 T3

2001-10-31 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2001-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900287 20011031

2001-09-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-09-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20010301;LT PAYMENT 20010301;LV PAYMENT 20010301;MK PAYMENT 20010301;RO PAYMENT 20010301;SI PAYMENT 20010301

2001-09-26 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

2001-09-26 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010926

2001-09-26 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010926

2001-09-26 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010926

2001-09-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 206250 T 20011015

2001-09-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: FROEHLICH, BERNHARD

2001-09-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WELCKER, FRIEDRICH

2001-08-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010713

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010201

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20010301;LT PAYMENT 20010301;LV PAYMENT 20010301;MK PAYMENT 20010301;RO PAYMENT 20010301;SI PAYMENT 20010301