Global Patent Index - EP 1101257 A1

EP 1101257 A1 2001-05-23 - INTERLOCKING PLUG-IN CONNECTOR PART FOR AN ELECTRICAL PLUG-IN CONNECTOR

Title (en)

INTERLOCKING PLUG-IN CONNECTOR PART FOR AN ELECTRICAL PLUG-IN CONNECTOR

Title (de)

VERRIEGELBARES STECKVERBINDUNGSTEIL FÜR EINEN ELEKTRISCHEN STECKVERBINDER

Title (fr)

ELEMENT DE CONNEXION ENFICHABLE VERROUILLABLE POUR UN CONNECTEUR ELECTRIQUE ENFICHABLE

Publication

EP 1101257 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99931184 A

Priority

  • DE 19830671 A
  • EP 9904425 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19830671A1] The invention relates to an interlocking plug-in connector part (1) for an electrical plug-in connector essentially comprising a case (2) for locating electrical contact elements and a bayonet ring (4). The bayonet ring (4) is mounted in such a way that it may be displaced in longitudinal direction in relation to the case (2). The bayonet ring (4) may be moved from an assembled position in which the end on the cable outlet side of the bayonet ring (4) is arranged on the plane of the end (8) on the cable outlet side of the case (2) or on a plane which is staggered in the direction of connection in relation to the plane of the end (8) on the cable outlet side of the case (2). When the bayonet ring (4) is spaced from the assembled position, it may be brought to a connecting position by longitudinal displacing it in longitudinal direction, the end on the plug-in side of the bayonet ring (4) being then positioned in the area of the final section of the cable outlet side of the case (2). In said position, the bayonet ring (4) is supported on a plug-in stop (11) allocated to the case (2) to push in the case (2) into a guide bushing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/213; H01R 13/625

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/213 (2006.01); H01R 13/436 (2006.01); H01R 13/506 (2006.01); H01R 13/625 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/506 (2013.01); H01R 13/4361 (2013.01); H01R 13/625 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0003457A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19830671 A1 20000120; AU 4777999 A 20000201; BR 9910338 A 20010109; BR 9910338 B1 20120110; EP 1101257 A1 20010523; EP 1101257 B1 20020731; ES 2177297 T3 20021201; JP 2002520787 A 20020709; JP 4458672 B2 20100428; US 6422903 B1 20020723; WO 0003457 A1 20000120; WO 0003457 B1 20000309

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180509

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-06-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170703

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170626

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170621

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070625

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-07-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030506

2002-12-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021119

2002-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2177297 T3

2002-10-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-09-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902211 20020905

2002-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-07-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011210

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000825

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT