Global Patent Index - EP 1101286 A1

EP 1101286 A1 2001-05-23 - A LEVEL CONVERTER PROVIDED WITH SLEW-RATE CONTROLLING MEANS

Title (en)

A LEVEL CONVERTER PROVIDED WITH SLEW-RATE CONTROLLING MEANS

Title (de)

PEGELUMSETZER MIT ANSTIEGSZEITSTEURUNGSVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

CONVERTISSEUR DE NIVEAU COMPORTANT UN MOYEN DE CONTROLE DE LA VITESSE DE MONTEE

Publication

EP 1101286 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00936774 A

Priority

  • EP 00936774 A
  • EP 0004626 W
  • EP 99201681 A
  • EP 99202595 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0074239A1] A level converter for the converting of a first digital signal (U1) having a first voltage range into a second digital signal (U2) having a second voltage range comprising an amplifier (T0) having an input for receiving the first digital signal (U1) and an output for supplying the second digital signal (U2), a series arrangement for controlling the slew-rate of the second digital signal (U2) which comprises at least a first capacitor (C1) and a second capacitor (C2) and which is coupled between the output and the input of the amplifier (T0), and voltage controlling means for controlling the voltages (VC1, VC2) across the at least first and second capacitors (C1, C2). The voltage controlling means comprises at least one voltage source (Vls1, Vls2) for supplying a separate bias voltage to each internal node (N1, N2) of the series arrangement. The value of the separate bias voltage or the values of the separate bias voltages is / are dependent on the values of the first (U1) and the second (U2) digital signals.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H03K 17/16; H03K 19/003

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H03K 19/0185 (2006.01); H03K 17/16 (2006.01); H03K 19/003 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H03K 19/00361 (2013.01); H03K 17/166 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0074239A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 0074239 A1 20001207; DE 60032210 D1 20070118; DE 60032210 T2 20070913; EP 1101286 A1 20010523; EP 1101286 B1 20061206; JP 2003501855 A 20030114; JP 4542731 B2 20100915; US 6380761 B1 20020430

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130519

2014-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-03-06 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60032210

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-01-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130519

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120730

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120618

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120531

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-11-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070907

2007-06-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-06-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2007-01-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60032210 P 20070118

2006-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2006-12-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-12-06 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061206

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2001-08-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010607

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI