Global Patent Index - EP 1101298 A1

EP 1101298 A1 2001-05-23 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR IMPLEMENTING HANDOFF IN MOBILE COMMNICATION SYSTEM WITH SHORT SYNC CHANNEL

Title (en)

APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR IMPLEMENTING HANDOFF IN MOBILE COMMNICATION SYSTEM WITH SHORT SYNC CHANNEL

Title (de)

GERÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUM AUFBAU VON RUFÜBERGABEN IN MOBILEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEMEN MIT EINEM KANAL MIT KURZER SYNCHRONISATION

Title (fr)

APPAREIL ET PROCEDE UTILES POUR REALISER LE TRANSFERT DANS UN SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE AYANT UNE VOIE DE SYNCHRONISATION COURTE

Publication

EP 1101298 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00935686 A

Priority

  • KR 0000568 W
  • KR 19990019681 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0074275A1] The method for implementing a handoff, in which a mobile station travels from a present cell of an async base station to a cell of a sync base station, includes the steps of: the mobile station's receiving a pseudo-noise (PN) offset signal from the sync base station for a predetermined time, the PN offset signal indicating a specific PN offset value of the sync base station; the mobile station's reporting the PN offset value to the async base station; the mobile station's receiving system information about the sync base station from the async base station; and the mobile station's performing the handoff to the cell of the sync base station based on the received system information.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04B 7/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04B 7/26 (2006.01); H04W 36/08 (2009.01); H04W 48/12 (2009.01); H04W 56/00 (2009.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04W 36/0072 (2013.01); H04W 56/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0074275A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0074275 A1 20001207; AU 5111400 A 20001218; AU 760716 B2 20030522; BR 0006167 A 20010417; CA 2337917 A1 20001207; CN 1304594 A 20010718; EP 1101298 A1 20010523; JP 2003501871 A 20030114; KR 100350466 B1 20020828; KR 20000075204 A 20001215

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB IT SE

2004-05-06 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040304

2001-10-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HWANG, SUNG-OH

2001-10-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KANG, HEE-WON C/O SAMSUNG ELEC.CO.LTD.9TH FLOOR

2001-10-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MAENG, SEUNG-JOO C/O SAMSUNG ELECTR.CO. LTD.

2001-10-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: AHN, JAE-MIN C/O SAMSUNG ELEC.CO.LTD. 9TH FLOOR

2001-10-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: YUN, YU-SUK

2001-06-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HWANG, SUNG-OH

2001-06-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KANG, HEE-WON C/O SAMSUNG ELEC.CO.LTD.9TH FLOOR

2001-06-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MAENG, SEUNG-JOO

2001-06-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: AHN, JAE-MIN C/O SAMSUNG ELEC.CO.LTD. 9TH FLOOR

2001-06-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: YUN, YU-SUK

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010130

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE