Global Patent Index - EP 1101299 A2

EP 1101299 A2 2001-05-23 - COMMUNICATION ARRANGEMENT COMPRISING AT LEAST ONE CENTRAL COMMUNICATION DEVICE TO WHICH WIRELESS NETWORK TERMINATION DEVICES CAN BE CONNECTED FOR CONNECTING COMMUNICATION TERMINALS

Title (en)

COMMUNICATION ARRANGEMENT COMPRISING AT LEAST ONE CENTRAL COMMUNICATION DEVICE TO WHICH WIRELESS NETWORK TERMINATION DEVICES CAN BE CONNECTED FOR CONNECTING COMMUNICATION TERMINALS

Title (de)

KOMMUNIKATIONSANORDNUNG MIT ZUMINDEST EINER ZENTRALEN KOMMUNIKATIONSEINRICHTUNG, AN DIE DRAHTLOSE NETZABSCHLUSSEINRICHTUNGEN FÜR DEN ANSCHLUSS VON KOMMUNIKATIONSENDGERÄTEN ANSCHLIESSBAR SIND

Title (fr)

ENSEMBLE DE COMMUNICATION COMPORTANT AU MOINS UN DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION CENTRAL AUQUEL PEUVENT ETRE RACCORDES DES DISPOSITIFS DE TERMINAISON DE RESEAU SANS FIL POUR LE RACCORDEMENT DE TERMINAUX DE COMMUNICATION

Publication

EP 1101299 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99945858 A

Priority

  • DE 9902002 W
  • DE 19834634 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19834634A1] According to the invention, extra wireless communication links (zbk) are established in a communication arrangement comprising at least one central communication device (RBS) to which wireless network termination devices (RNT1, ...5) can be connected in addition to communication links (kb) between said central communication device (RBS) and said network termination devices (RNT1 ...5). Said wireless communication links which are established between the network termination devices (RNT1...5) enable direct communication of information between said network termination devices (RNT1, ...5). Consequently, a step migration is advantageously made possible towards communication networks organised in a decentralised manner.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04B 7/26; H04L 12/56; H04L 29/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04W 16/26 (2009.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04W 16/26 (2013.01); H04L 5/0016 (2013.01); H04L 5/0037 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0008874A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19834634 A1 20000203; DE 19834634 C2 20020620; EP 1101299 A2 20010523; US 7075915 B1 20060711; WO 0008874 A2 20000217; WO 0008874 A3 20000511

INPADOC legal status


2010-05-26 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091204

2007-12-12 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT

- Owner name: NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS GMBH & CO. KG

2007-11-14 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT

- Owner name: NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS S.P.A.

2007-10-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS GMBH & CO. KG

2007-01-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061215

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001215

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE