Global Patent Index - EP 1101312 A1

EP 1101312 A1 2001-05-23 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR GENERATING SYNC WORD AND TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING THE SYNC WORD IN W-CDMA COMMUNICATION SYSTEM

Title (en)

APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR GENERATING SYNC WORD AND TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING THE SYNC WORD IN W-CDMA COMMUNICATION SYSTEM

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINES SYNC-WORTES UND SENDEN UND EMPFANGEN DIESES SYNC-WORTES IN EINEM W-CDMA NACHRICHTEN ÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEM

Title (fr)

APPAREIL ET PROCEDE POUR GENERER DES MARQUEURS, LES EMETTRE ET EN RECEVOIR DANS UN SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATIONS W-CDMA

Publication

EP 1101312 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00935677 A

Priority

  • KR 0000553 W
  • KR 19990019644 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0074290A1] There is provided a method of synchronizing received sync frames to reference sync frames. Each of the received sync frames and the reference sync frames has a sync word and is divided into a predetermined number of slots and each slot is divided into a plurality of bits. In the method, a frame sync word is provided to have a first correlation when the reference sync frames are synchronized with the received sync frames and a second correlation different from the first correlation when the received sync word is shifted version of the reference sync word by one of the two specific numbers of slots, for example, such as (5) or (10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04J 13/00; H04B 1/707; H04B 7/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04B 1/707 (2006.01); H04B 7/26 (2006.01); H04L 7/00 (2006.01); H04L 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04B 1/7075 (2013.01); H04B 7/2681 (2013.01); H04W 56/0085 (2013.01); H04L 7/04 (2013.01); H04L 7/041 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0074290 A1 20001207; AU 5110700 A 20001218; AU 751344 B2 20020815; BR 0006151 A 20010417; CA 2338046 A1 20001207; CN 1315090 A 20010926; EP 1101312 A1 20010523; EP 1101312 A4 20050622; JP 2003501875 A 20030114; KR 100396286 B1 20030902; KR 20000075188 A 20001215

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-29 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041201

2005-06-22 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20050510

2005-06-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04J 13/00 A

2005-06-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04B 7/26 B

2005-06-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04B 1/707 B

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB IT SE

2001-07-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PARK, JIN-SOO C/O SAMSUNG ELECT.CO.LTD.9TH FLOOR

2001-07-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KIM, JAE-YOEL C/O SAMSUNG ELEC.CO.LTD.9TH FLOOR

2001-07-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CHOI, HO-KYU C/O SAMSUNG ELEC.CO.LTD. 9TH FLOOR

2001-07-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KANG, HEE-WON C/O SAMSUNG ELEC.CO.LTD.9TH FLOOR

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010129

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE