Global Patent Index - EP 1101390 A1

EP 1101390 A1 2001-05-23 - HEARING AID HAVING AN IMPROVED SPEECH INTELLIGIBILITY BY MEANS OF FREQUENCY SELECTIVE SIGNAL PROCESSING, AND A METHOD FOR OPERATING SUCH A HEARING AID

Title (en)

HEARING AID HAVING AN IMPROVED SPEECH INTELLIGIBILITY BY MEANS OF FREQUENCY SELECTIVE SIGNAL PROCESSING, AND A METHOD FOR OPERATING SUCH A HEARING AID

Title (de)

HÖRHILFE MIT VERBESSERTER SPRACHVERSTÄNDLICHKEIT DURCH FREQUENZSELEKTIVE SIGNALVERARBEITUNG SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINER DERARTIGEN HÖRHILFE

Title (fr)

APPAREIL AUDITIF PERMETTANT UNE MEILLEURE COMPREHENSION DE LA PAROLE GRACE A UN TRAITEMENT DE SIGNAL SELECTIF EN FREQUENCE, ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE FAIRE FONCTIONNER UN TEL APPAREIL AUDITIF

Publication

EP 1101390 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99934667 A

Priority

  • DE 19833434 A
  • EP 9904884 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0005923A1] The invention relates to a hearing aid comprising a microphone (1), a signal processing unit (2) and a listening device (3), whereby the signal processing unit (2) has a filter element (6) for splitting the signal into a number of partial signals (12). In addition, the hearing aid comprises an analyzing element (7) for detecting speech information found in the partial signals (12), and has a conditioning element (8) for boosting the partial signals (12) during the availability of speech. The invention also relates to a method for operating such a hearing aid.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 25/00; G10L 21/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10L 21/0208 (2013.01); H04R 25/00 (2006.01); G10L 21/0232 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10L 21/0208 (2013.01); H04R 25/505 (2013.01); G10L 21/0232 (2013.01); H04R 2225/43 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0005923A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0005923 A1 20000203; DK 1101390 T3 20040802; EP 1101390 A1 20010523; EP 1101390 B1 20040414; US 6768801 B1 20040727

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160731

2017-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160801

2017-04-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160731

2017-04-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160731

2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170201

2017-04-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170331

2017-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-02-20 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20170131

2017-02-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59909190

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150730

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150723

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150722

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20150727

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-23 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SIVANTOS GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SIEMENS AUDIOLOGISCHE TECHNIK GMBH, 91058 ERLANGEN, DE

- Document: DE 59909190

2015-10-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59909190

- Representative's name: MAIER, DANIEL OLIVER, DIPL.-ING. UNIV., DE

2015-07-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG;INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY FREILAGERSTRASSE 40;8047 ZUERICH (CH)

2005-04-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050117

2004-12-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-12-01 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-08-02 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-05-19 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-05-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59909190 P 20040519

2004-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-04-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2004-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR LI

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001221

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE